Durham v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Carolyn Durham
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Interested Party: Social Security - Office of the General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2024cv01377
Filed: October 8, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joe Billy McDade
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2024 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT. Plaintiff Brief due by 1/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript)(Patel, Hinal)
December 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Certified Administrative Record in Lieu of Answer (Patel, Hinal)
December 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Hinal A Patel on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley (Patel, Hinal)
December 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Martin J. O'Malley (Hugo, Megan)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915 is GRANTED. The Motion was submitted under penalty of perjury and sufficiently demonstrates that the Plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee in this action. Entered by Judge Joe Billy McDade on 10/10/2024. (NJR)
October 10, 2024 NOTICE of Social Security Complaint filed. Martin J. O'Malley answer due on 12/9/2024. (BL)
October 9, 2024 Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley no longer assigned to case. (WG)
October 8, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carolyn Durham. Responses due by 10/22/2024 (Konoski, Bryan)
October 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley, filed by Carolyn Durham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Konoski, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Durham
Represented By: Bryan Matthew Konoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security - Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. O'Malley
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Represented By: Hinal A Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?