Davis v. Illinois Department of Human Services
Plaintiff: Dyamond Davis
Defendant: Illinois Department of Human Services
Case Number: 2:2018cv02246
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/14/2018. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #12 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to November 27, 2018. (KE, ilcd)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Illinois Department of Human Services. Responses due by 11/27/2018 (Grady, Dylan)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/1/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Dylan P Grady on behalf of Illinois Department of Human Services (Grady, Dylan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dyamond Davis. Illinois Department of Human Services served by Alias Summons on 10/25/18 (SKR, ilcd)
October 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Illinois Department of Human Services answer due 11/13/2018. (SKR, ilcd)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dyamond Davis. Illinois Department of Human Services served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (KE, ilcd)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tammy Jo Lenzy on behalf of Dyamond Davis (Lenzy, Tammy)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 Alias Summons Issued as to Illinois Department of Human Services. (Sent to USMS for service.) (KE, ilcd)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Illinois Department of Human Services. (Sent to USMS for service.) (KE, ilcd)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/28/2018. Plaintiff has submitted a complaint and an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #2 , which is hereby GRANTED. It is ordered that the United States Marshal serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis upon the Defendant as directed by Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Dyamond Davis. (Lenzy, Tammy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Dyamond Davis.(KE, ilcd) Modified on 9/28/2018 to correct event type. (KE, ilcd).
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Illinois Department of Human Services, filed by Dyamond Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Illinois Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Department of Human Services
Represented By: Dylan P Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyamond Davis
Represented By: Tammy Jo Lenzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?