Adams v. Champaign County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Dale B Adams
Defendant: Larry Zonfrilli, Unknown Champaign County Sheriff's Police Officers, Allen Jones, David Madigan, Andrew Deal, Champaign County Sheriff's Office, Rantoul Police Department, Charles A Casagrande and Village of Rantoul
Case Number: 2:2018cv02320
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/21/19. Request for Waiver of Service and Notice of Lawsuit #13 is STRICKEN as it was filed with the wrong event. (TC, ilcd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Deal. Andrew Deal waiver sent on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Yu, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Thomas S Yu on behalf of Andrew Deal (Yu, Thomas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 **STRICKEN** REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Dale B. Adams on February 21, 2019. (Yu, Thomas) Modified on 2/21/19 to show **STRICKEN** as wrong event chosen (refiled as #15 )(TC, ilcd).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/21/2019. Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel #11 is DENIED. See written Order. (DS, ilcd)
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Dale B Adams. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process Mailing to the Defendants by Dale B Adams. (KE, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons sent to Parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KE, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Waivers of Service sent to Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT Affirming re #3 Amended Complaint by Dale B Adams. (KE, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Plaintiff Dale B Adams. Responses due by 2/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Plaintiff regarding service of complaint and motions. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (KE, ilcd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Mailed to Plaintiff Adams at 2313 Anvil Drive, Harrison, AZ 72601 for service.) (KE, ilcd)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dale B Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/23/2019. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #2 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [2-1] and its accompanying exhibits instanter. (KE, ilcd)
January 22, 2019 Filing fee paid: $400, receipt number 24626008391. (TC, ilcd)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Dale B Adams. Responses due by 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits)(KE, ilcd)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/31/18. Plaintiff has filed a Complaint and has included personal check #2722 for the $400.00 filing fee. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.7(B)(1)(b), payment of the filing fee must be made by cash, cashiers check, law firm check, money order or credit card and therefore, the Clerk is directed to return the original check to Dale Adams at address on the docket. Within 21 days of the entry of this text order, plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee in in full by money order or cashiers check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court, or by credit card (NOT debit card) via telephone to the Urbana Clerks Office. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. ( Miscellaneous Deadline set 1/22/2019)(KM, ilcd)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dale B Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-9, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(KM, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/31/2018: #5 Envelope) (KM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Champaign County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Zonfrilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Champaign County Sheriff's Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Deal
Represented By: Thomas S Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champaign County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rantoul Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A Casagrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Rantoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale B Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?