Switzer v. Dillman Eye Care Associates et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Switzer
Defendant: David Dillman and Dillman Eye Care Associates
Case Number: 2:2019cv02005
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Copying Records (Subpoenas to Carle and Gailey Eye Clinic) (Wurl, Daniel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Renee L Monfort on behalf of David Dillman, Dillman Eye Care Associates (Monfort, Renee)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/19/2019. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/19/2019. Defendants' Motion for Protective Order #9 is GRANTED. The Court will enter the proposed HIPPA Qualified Protective Order separately. (DS, ilcd)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Protective Order (HIPAA Qualified Protectived Order by Defendants David Dillman, Dillman Eye Care Associates. Responses due by 3/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wurl, Daniel)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by David Dillman, Dillman Eye Care Associates.(Wurl, Daniel)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by David Dillman, Dillman Eye Care Associates. (Wurl, Daniel)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/6/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (DS, ilcd)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel P Wurl on behalf of David Dillman, Dillman Eye Care Associates (Wurl, Daniel)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/15/2019. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #4 cures the jurisdictional deficiencies outlined in the Court's January 11, 2019, Order to Show Cause #3 . Accordingly, the Order to Show Cause #3 is discharged. (JMB, ilcd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Barbara Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Montgomery, Robert)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCHARGED - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/11/2019. Show Cause Response due by 2/1/2019. See written Order. (DS, ilcd) Modified on 1/15/2019 to show the order as discharged pursuant to the filing of the Amended Complaint and the Court's text order dated 1/15/2019. (JMB, ilcd).
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to David Dillman, Dillman Eye Care Associates and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3008469.), filed by Barbara Switzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Summons on Dillman Eye Care Associates, #4 Summons on Dr. David Dillman, #5 Expert Report)(Montgomery, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Switzer v. Dillman Eye Care Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dillman
Represented By: Daniel P Wurl
Represented By: Renee L Monfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillman Eye Care Associates
Represented By: Daniel P Wurl
Represented By: Renee L Monfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Switzer
Represented By: Robert A Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?