Melton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sherri L. Melton and Sherri L Melton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02008
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Sara Darrow
2 Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Sherri L Melton as to Commissioner of Social Security - Attorney General's Office, Washington, DC served on 1/30/2019. (TC, ilcd)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/16/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (TC, ilcd)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/16/19 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The US Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon Defendants; all costs of service shall be advanced by the U.S. See written Order. (Attachments: #1 Consent Packet) (TC, ilcd) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/16/19 to correct Case No.) (TC, ilcd).
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: This case is reassigned to Judge Sara Darrow for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long will remain as referral judge on case. Entered by Chief Judge James E. Shadid on 1/16/19. (KM, ilcd)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Meredith E Marcus on behalf of Sherri L. Melton (Marcus, Meredith)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Frederick J Daley, Jr on behalf of Sherri L. Melton (Daley, Frederick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sherri L. Melton. Responses due by 1/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 USM-285 (Commissioner), #2 USM-285 (Attorney General), #3 USM-285 (U.S. Attorney))(Daley, Frederick)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Sherri L. Melton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses Combined)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-URBANA SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri L. Melton
Represented By: Meredith E Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri L Melton
Represented By: Meredith E Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J Daley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?