Pouliot v. Board of Trustees of University of Illinois et al

Plaintiff: Dominique Pouliot
Defendant: Craig Hoefer, Denise Donnelly, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois and Dale Van Harligen
Case Number: 2:2019cv02067
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/20/2019. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint #40 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 7/24/19. (JMB, ilcd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Khetarpal, Monica)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/19/2019. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/19 is VACATED. The dates set at the 4/16/19 Scheduling Conference remain in place. (JMB, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/13/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/13/2019. Defendants' Motion to Stay #36 is DENIED as MOOT. The Court will proceed with setting this matter for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (JMB, ilcd)
June 13, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Dominique Pouliot. (Hunt, Keith)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 6/10/2019. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #20 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is GRANTED as to Counts I, II, X, and XI. Those counts are dismissed. It is DENIED in all other respects. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for further proceedings in accordance with this order. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen. Responses due by 6/13/2019 (Khetarpal, Monica)
April 16, 2019 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held 4/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Keith Hunt and Brad Faber. Appearance for Defendant by Monica Khetarpal. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 6/1/19. Amended pleadings due by 10/1/19. Joinder of parties due by 10/1/19. Plaintiff's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 12/1/19. Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 1/15/20. Defendant's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 2/1/20. Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 3/1/20. Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 4/1/20. Case dispositive motions due by 5/1/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. (4 days) Status Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. (Tape #UR-B: 11:01 AM.) (KE, ilcd)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/2/2019. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #34 and pursuant to the Order #33 scheduling this matter for a Rule 16 hearing conference by personal appearance on 4/16/19 at 11:00 AM, the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on the same date at the same time. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd)
April 1, 2019 Filing 34 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Dominique Pouliot. (Faber, Bradley)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/21/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (JMB, ilcd)
March 20, 2019 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06147. .
March 20, 2019 Filing 31 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division the electronic record. (tt, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the court grants defendants' motion (Doc. #11 ) to transfer venue to the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division. This matter is ordered transferred to the Central District of Illinois, Urbana Division. Status hearings set for 3/12/2019 and 4/30/2019 are stricken. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/6/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
February 26, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. In Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Khetarpal, Monica)
February 5, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file plaintiff's response to defendants' motion to dismiss #25 is granted. Plaintiff's response due 2/5/2019, defendants' reply due 2/26/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Dominique L. Pouliot to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. #20 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G)(Faber, Bradley)
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion For an Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Edwin Faber for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #25 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 2/5/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Faber, Bradley)
January 31, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Dominique L. Pouliot for extension of time to file response/reply Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion For An Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Faber, Bradley)
January 3, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 1/3/2019. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss #20 due by 1/31/2019, defendants' reply due 2/14/2019. Status hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
December 26, 2018 Filing 23 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Monica Hersh Khetarpal for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/3/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Khetarpal, Monica)
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Monica Hersh Khetarpal for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/2/2019 at 09:15 PM. (Khetarpal, Monica)
December 20, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Khetarpal, Monica)
December 20, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. (Khetarpal, Monica)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D.in Support of MOTION by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. to transfer case DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #11 DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Khetarpal, Monica)
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Dominique L. Pouliotin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. to transfer case DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #11 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Decl. of Dr. Pouliot, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Comparison of Districts Within the Seventh Circuit, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - K.McCarthy's Address Search, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - U of I Physics Dept. Employee Listing, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Meng Lin Salary, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Yuxuan Wang Salary, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Meng Lin Address Search, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Yuxuan Wang Address Search, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Zhenyu Wang Address Search, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Sklenar Address Search, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Jokisaari Address Search, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - Kamin Address Search)(Faber, Bradley)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' unopposed motion #15 for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading due 12/20/2018. Mailed notice (cn).
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Monica Hersh Khetarpal for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #15 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/14/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Khetarpal, Monica)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. for extension of time to file response/reply as to complaint #1 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Khetarpal, Monica)
November 6, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 11/6/2018. Plaintiff's response to defendants' motion #11 to transfer venue due 12/6/2018, defendant's reply due 12/20/2018. Status hearing set for 3/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Monica Hersh Khetarpal for presentment of motion to transfer case #11 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/6/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Khetarpal, Monica)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. in support of motion to transfer case #11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3)(Khetarpal, Monica)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. to transfer case DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Khetarpal, Monica)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dominique L. Pouliot. Denise Donnelly waiver sent on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Hunt, Keith)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dominique L. Pouliot. Craig Hoefer waiver sent on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Hunt, Keith)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dominique L. Pouliot. Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. waiver sent on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Hunt, Keith)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dominique L. Pouliot. The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois waiver sent on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Hunt, Keith)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. by Priya Prakash Khatkhate ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Khatkhate, Priya)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Denise Donnelly, Craig Hoefer, The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois, Dale Van Harligen, Ph.D. by Monica Hersh Khetarpal ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Khetarpal, Monica)
September 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (pj, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dominique L. Pouliot by Bradley Edwin Faber Hunt & Associates, P.C. (Faber, Bradley)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dominique L. Pouliot by Keith L. Hunt , Hunt & Associates, P.C. (Hunt, Keith)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hunt, Keith)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 18 cv 6147 filed by Dominique L. Pouliot; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14922548. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Hunt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pouliot v. Board of Trustees of University of Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Hoefer
Represented By: Priya Prakash Khatkhate
Represented By: Monica Hersh Khetarpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Donnelly
Represented By: Priya Prakash Khatkhate
Represented By: Monica Hersh Khetarpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of University of Illinois
Represented By: Priya Prakash Khatkhate
Represented By: Monica Hersh Khetarpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Van Harligen
Represented By: Priya Prakash Khatkhate
Represented By: Monica Hersh Khetarpal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Pouliot
Represented By: Keith L Hunt
Represented By: Bradley Edwin Faber
Represented By: Bradley E Faber
Represented By: Keith Lee Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?