Navarrete-Soto v. Rantoul Foods
Plaintiff: Sergio Navarrete-Soto
Defendant: Rantoul Foods
Case Number: 2:2019cv02127
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Sergio Navarrete-Soto. Responses due by 7/23/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered to pro se plaintiff re #9 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof (KM, ilcd)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Defendant Rantoul Foods. Responses due by 7/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Brian Michael Smith on behalf of Rantoul Foods (Smith, Brian)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Rantoul Foods served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (TC, ilcd)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/16/2019. For the reasons stated in the order, Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel #3 is DENIED. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rantoul Foods and sent to the US Marshal for service. (JMB, ilcd)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/16/2019. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #2 which is here GRANTED, giving Plaintiff leave to proceed without prepayment of fees and costs. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Sergio Navarrete-Soto. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (JMB, ilcd)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sergio Navarrete-Soto. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM 285)(JMB, ilcd)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rantoul Foods, filed by Sergio Navarrete-Soto.(JMB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarrete-Soto v. Rantoul Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rantoul Foods
Represented By: Brian Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Navarrete-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?