Karr v. City of Decatur, Illinois

Plaintiff: Trudy Karr
Defendant: City of Decatur, Illinois and City of Decatur Illinois
Case Number: 2:2019cv02134
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trudy Karr. City of Decatur Illinois waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Baker, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Decatur Police Dept on 06/04/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baker, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Trudy Karr. (Baker, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Decatur, Illinois ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3111003.), filed by Trudy Karr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karr v. City of Decatur, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Decatur, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Decatur Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Karr
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?