Gedda v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Glen Gedda
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02155
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Sara Darrow
2 Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Gedda. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/2/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Sellers, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for all further proceedings. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce is no longer assigned to case. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/17/19. (KM, ilcd)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Stephen Sellers on behalf of Glen Gedda (Sellers, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3128052.), filed by Glen Gedda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Sellers, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gedda v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Gedda
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?