Gotter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anthony D Gotter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02176
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Eric I Long
Referring Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Anthony D Gotter as to CSS-Social Security Administration 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Anthony D Gotter as to CSS-Social Security Administration 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Anthony D Gotter as to Commissioner of Social Security 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Attorney General on 07/17/2019, filed by Anthony D Gotter. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 07/17/2019, filed by Anthony D Gotter. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney on 07/17/2019, filed by Anthony D Gotter. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (originals mailed to plaintiff's counsel for service). (KM, ilcd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Todd D Lichtenberger on behalf of Anthony D Gotter. (KM, ilcd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400; receipt 24626008791), filed by Anthony D Gotter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses) (KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gotter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D Gotter
Represented By: Todd D Lichtenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?