Washington v. Supervalu Inc
Plaintiff: Darnell Washington
Defendant: Supervalu Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02211
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held 9/25/19 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by David Levin. Appearance for Defendant by Amanda Inskeep. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 9/28/19; Amended pleadings due by 1/10/20; Joinder of parties due by 1/10/20; Plaintiff's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 4/1/20; Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 5/1/20; Defendant's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 6/1/20; Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 7/1/20; Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 7/1/20; Case dispositive motions due by 7/31/20. Status Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 10:15 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 12/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Trial estimated 3 days. (Tape #UR-B 10:00 AM.) (SKR, ilcd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 (CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT) by Supervalu Inc. (Inskeep, Amanda)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Supervalu Inc.(Inskeep, Amanda)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/11/19. This Court has reviewed the parties Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #10 and the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM. The Court will initiate the call. (SKR, ilcd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Darnell Washington. (Levin, David)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Amanda E Inskeep on behalf of Supervalu Inc (Inskeep, Amanda)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/20/19. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (SKR, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/20/19. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/23/19. (SKR, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendant Supervalu Inc. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Nowak, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jeffrey Scott Nowak on behalf of Supervalu Inc (Nowak, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darnell Washington. Supervalu Inc served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Levin, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Supervalu Inc. and mailed to plaintiff's attorney for service (SKR, ilcd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven Gene Perry on behalf of Darnell Washington (Perry, Steven)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David Brian Levin on behalf of Darnell Washington (Levin, David)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Supervalu, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3161823.), filed by Darnell Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Levin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Supervalu Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Washington
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: David Brian Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supervalu Inc
Represented By: Amanda E Inskeep
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?