United States of America v. Kendall et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Daniel Kendall and Amber Kendall
Case Number: 2:2019cv02214
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
2 Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daniel Kendall and provided to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB, ilcd)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Effective 9/1/2019 this case is reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce for further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/30/19. (DK, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Amber Kendall waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Hoff, David)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/2/2019. Case reassigned to Judge James E. Shadid for all further proceedings. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce no longer assigned to case(JMB, ilcd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service of United States' Notice of Foreclosure upon the City of Watseka. (Hoff, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Daniel Kendall on 8/2/19. (Hoff, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Amber Kendall n/k/a Amber Kissack on 8/2/19. (Hoff, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of foreclosure by United States of America (Hoff, David)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoff, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kendall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David H Hoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?