McFarland v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Nicholas L McFarland
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02224
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
2 Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Set Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security answer due 12/20/2019 due to the Return of Service d/e #7 . (JMB, ilcd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Nicholas L McFarland as to CSS-Social Security Administration 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Nicholas L McFarland as to CSS-Social Security Administration 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Nicholas L McFarland as to Commissioner of Social Security 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Effective 9/1/2019 this case is reassigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce for further proceedings. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/30/19. (DK, ilcd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Attorney General on 08/20/2019, filed by Nicholas L McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney on 08/20/2019, filed by Nicholas L McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 08/20/2019, filed by Nicholas L McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB, ilcd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3174770.), filed by Nicholas L McFarland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons AG, #5 Notice of Appearance)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 8/19/2019. Case reassigned to Judge Sue E. Myerscough for all further proceedings. Judge Colin Stirling Bruce no longer assigned to case. (JMB, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas L McFarland
Represented By: Todd D Lichtenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?