Thompson v. Jeld-Wen Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Thompson
Defendant: Jeld-Wen Inc, Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv02241
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service regarding Rule 26 Initial Disclosures. (Murphy, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/28/19. Plaintiff's Memorandum containing his Rule 26 Initial Disclosures #20 is STRICKEN. The Court reminds Plaintiff that pursuant to CDIL-LR 26.3(A), discovery disclosures are NOT filed with the court. Parties should file only a certificate of service. (SKR, ilcd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 *STRICKEN* MEMORANDUM Plaintiff Kenneth Thompson's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Kenneth Thompson. (Drazen, Andrew) Modified on 10/28/2019 to show document is stricken pursuant to Text Order entered 10/28/19 (SKR, ilcd).
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held 10/22/19 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Andrew Drazen. Appearance for Defendant by Michael Murphy. Rule 16 conference held by telephone. Plan approved; dates set. Consent to magistrate judge discussed (form attached). ADR options offered, including court-hosted settlement conference. The following discovery deadlines are set: Initial disclosure due by 10/25/19; Amended pleadings due by 1/17/20; Joinder of parties due by 1/17/20; Plaintiff's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 4/24/20; Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 5/29/20; Defendant's expert disclosure and expert reports due by 6/26/20; Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 7/31/20; Discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 8/14/20; Case dispositive motions due by 8/28/20. Status Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:45 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long to discuss possible court hosted mediation or summary trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 1/12/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Trial estimated 4 days. (Tape #UR-B 10:20 AM.) (SKR, ilcd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc. (Murphy, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Murphy, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Jeld-Wen Inc.(Murphy, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/4/19. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #14 and the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:15 AM is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (SKR, ilcd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kenneth Thompson.(SKR, ilcd)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/4/19. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint #13 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [13-1] instanter. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(E), the pending Motions to Dismiss #5 and #7 are denied as MOOT. (SKR, ilcd)
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc, Jeld-Wen Inc. (Murphy, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kenneth Thompson. Responses due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit 1)(Drazen, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response in opposition to Def Jeld-Wen Inc's Rule 12(b)(6) Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Thompson. (Drazen, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss in Opposition to Def Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Thompson. (Drazen, Andrew)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/24/19. Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance of the Rule 16 Conference #10 is GRANTED. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/19 is RESCHEDULED to 10/22/19 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (SKR, ilcd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM Motion for Continuance of the Rule 16 Conference by Kenneth Thompson. (Drazen, Andrew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM Entry of Appearance by Kenneth Thompson. (Drazen, Andrew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Murphy, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Murphy, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Jeld-Wen Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Murphy, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Jeld-Wen Inc. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Murphy, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/10/19. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR, ilcd)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems, Inc., Jeld-Wen, Inc. (Murphy, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Patrick Murphy on behalf of All Defendants (Murphy, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Champaign County Circuit Court, case number 2019-L-108 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3190982), filed by Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems, Inc., Jeld-Wen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Jeld-Wen Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Thompson
Represented By: Andrew T Drazen
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Drazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeld-Wen Inc
Represented By: Michael Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeld-Wen Door Replacement Systems Inc
Represented By: Michael Patrick Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?