Wilkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John H Wilkins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv02260
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/22/2019. Pursuant to Local Rule 8.1, the Commissioner's deadline to file a responsive pleading and transcript of the administrative proceedings is 2/4/20. (Commissioner of Social Security answer due 2/4/2020)(DS, ilcd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by John H Wilkins as to CSS-Social Security Administration 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by John H Wilkins as to CSS-Social Security Administration 10/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by John H Wilkins as to Commissioner of Social Security 10/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney on 10/01/2019, filed by John H Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Attorney General on 10/01/2019, filed by John H Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Commissioner of Social Security on 10/01/2019, filed by John H Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3201574.), filed by John H Wilkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Commissioner, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 Notice of Appearance)(Lichtenberger, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H Wilkins
Represented By: Todd D Lichtenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?