Republic Technologies NA LLC et al v. Haze Tobacco et al
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies NA LLC and Sream Inc
Defendant: Haze Tobacco, John Doe, Nadia Elmatari and Falak Tobacco Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv02327
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants Falak Tobacco Inc and Nadia Elmatari (original Summonses returned to plaintiff's counsel for service). (KM, ilcd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sream Inc, Republic Technologies NA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Langone, Christopher)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee paid: $400, receipt number 24626009177. (TC, ilcd)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/16/2019. Plaintiff filed this Complaint on 11/26/19, but failed to pay the $400 filing fee. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee on or before 12/30/19, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. (Miscellaneous Deadline 12/30/2019)(DS, ilcd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark by Republic Technologies NA LLC, Sream Inc. (JMB, ilcd)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Haze Tobacco (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Republic Technologies NA LLC.(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies NA LLC et al v. Haze Tobacco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies NA LLC
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Christopher V Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haze Tobacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadia Elmatari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falak Tobacco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?