Mintun v. Kenco Logistic Services LLC
Plaintiff: Kathy Mintun and Tyron Hill-Patterson
Defendant: Kenco Logistic Services, LLC and Kenco Logistic Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02348
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT KENCO LOGISTIC SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedinga filed by Plaintiffs Tyron Hill-Patterson, Kathy Mintun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Treadwell v. Power Solutions (12.16.19) (WCA) (Alonso), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B1 - Ring Container 19L89 Memorandum of Decision (Albrecht) (WCA SOL), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B2 - Thomas v. KIK Custom Prods. (WCA) (Cohen), #4 Exhibit Exhibit B3 - Slater v. H&M Report of Proceedings 11-04-2019 (WCA) (Meyerson), #5 Exhibit Exhibit B4 - Woodard v. Dylan's Candybar Memo Order 19-1120 (WCA) (Demacopolous), #6 Exhibit Exhibit B5 - Carrasco v. Freudenberg (sol & WCA) (Kane), #7 Exhibit Exhibit B6 - Hughes v. Mayfield (WCA) (Meyerson), #8 Exhibit Exhibit B7 - Soltysik v. Parsec Report of Proceedings (WCA) (French Mallen), #9 Exhibit Exhibit B8 - Graziano v. Royal Die and Stamping (9.26.2019) (WCA) (Rohm), #10 Exhibit Exhibit B9 - Mims (WCA) (Demacopolous), #11 Exhibit Exhibit B10 - Robertson (WCA) (Cohen), #12 Exhibit Exhibit B11 - Ross v. Caremel - Transcript of motion to dismiss hearing (WCA) (Albrecht), #13 Exhibit Exhibit B12 - Fluker (WCA) (Mitchell), #14 Exhibit Exhibit B13 - McDonald (WCA) (Mitchell), #15 Exhibit Exhibit C - 200121 Order_Colon, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D - orders)(Fish, David)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenco Logistic Services LLC, filed by Kathy Mintun and Tyron Hill-Patterson.(TC, ilcd)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/7/20. Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report #8 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [8-1] instanter. The parties' deadline to file their Rule 26(f) Report is extended to 3/23/20. (TC, ilcd)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consent Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and for an Extension of Time to the Rule 26(f) Status Report Deadline by Plaintiff Kathy Mintun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Fish, David)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/4/20. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/20 is RESCHEDULED to 3/26/20 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 3/3/20. (TC, ilcd)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT KENCO LOGISTIC SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant Kenco Logistic Services LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Selvey, Jason)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David J Fish on behalf of Kathy Mintun (Fish, David)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/3/2020. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/3/20. (Kenco Logistic Services LLC answer due 2/3/2020) (DS, ilcd)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Kenco Logistic Services LLC. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (Kahn Mason, Jody)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/27/19. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (KM, ilcd)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason A Selvey on behalf of Kenco Logistic Services, LLC (Selvey, Jason)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jody Kahn Mason on behalf of Kenco Logistic Services, LLC (Kahn Mason, Jody)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit - Macon County, State of Illinois, case number 2019L105 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3269076), filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn Mason, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mintun v. Kenco Logistic Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenco Logistic Services, LLC
Represented By: Jody Kahn Mason
Represented By: Jason A Selvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenco Logistic Services LLC
Represented By: Jody Kahn Mason
Represented By: Jason A Selvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Mintun
Represented By: Brandon Michael Wise
Represented By: Paul A Lesko
Represented By: David J Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyron Hill-Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?