Scalia v. Miller et al
Petitioner: Eugene Scalia
Respondent: Elmer Miller
Case Number: 2:2019mc02002
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held 1/10/20 before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Appearance for Petitioner by Esther Mulder. Appearance by Respondent Elmer Miller pro se. Miscellaneous hearing held in person. Petitioner's Petition to Enforce #1 discussed. Petitioner moves for court to hold Respondent in contempt until Respondent fully complies with subpoenas. Respondent indicates that he will not have a problem complying with any subpoenas by the compliance dates. Court reserves ruling on contempt issue. Petitioner completed service of two additional subpoenas on Respondent during the hearing. Petitioner orally moves for equitable tolling of the enforcement period of limitations from the 6/13/19 inspection to the 3/6/20 hearing. Oral motion granted. Petitioner orally moves that Respondent waive service and provide reliable contact information on the record. Respondent agrees. Respondent will accept further service by mail as opposed to personal service. The oral motion is granted. Respondent provided an address for mailing documents and workable phone number as: 433 E. Co Road 100 N, Arcola, IL 61910, Ph #217-268-4546. Petitioner orally moves for Respondent to pay costs for obtaining compliance with subpoenas and reasonable attorney fees in this case. The Court reserves judgment on that issue. Petitioner orally moves for the Court to order Respondent to receive and return their phone calls. Oral motion granted. Court directs Petitioner to telephone Respondent only from 8 a.m. to 5 p.m. on normal business days. Court directs Respondent to return Petitioner's phone calls within 48 business hours. Court directs Respondent Miller to provide Petitioner the documents requested in the two subpoenas duces tecum, to be postmarked no later than 1/20/20. Deposition is scheduled for Respondent Miller on 1/30/20 at 10:00 a.m. at the US Courthouse in Urbana. Court orders Respondent Miller to appear for his deposition at that date and time. This matter is scheduled for further Miscellaneous Hearing for 3/6/20 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom A in Urbana before Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Petitioner to notify the Court regarding Respondent's compliance with subpoenas prior to the 3/6/20 hearing. The Court anticipates cancelling the 3/6/20 hearing if Petitioner reports Respondent's compliance. Clerk directed to mail a copy of Minutes to Pro se Plaintiff at address provided. (Court Reporter LC.) (TC, ilcd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order scheduling hearing and Order Recommending Contempt (2 affidavits) served on Elmer Miller on 12/20/19, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff. of Service for written and text contempt orders)(Mulder, Esther)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/20/19 re #1 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Issued by OSHA filed by Eugene Scalia. Due to the Respondent's failure to comply with the subpoena or to show cause for his failure to comply, the Court recommends that he be held in contempt. The parties are advised that any objection to this recommendation must be filed in writing with the clerk within 14 days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. See 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1). Failure to object will constitute a waiver of objections on appeal. The Court directs the Petitioner to serve a copy of this Order on Respondent. This matter remains set for a hearing before Judge Colin S. Bruce on 1/10/20 at 1:30 p.m. Courtroom A, 201. S. Vine St., Urbana, IL. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/20. (TC, ilcd)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/17/19. At the request of Petitioner, a hearing is set for 1/10/20 at 1:30 PM before Judge Colin S. Bruce, 201 S. Vine St., Urbana IL, Courtroom A. The Court directs Petitioner to serve notice of this order on Respondent. (TC, ilcd)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Complainant's Status Update to the Court (Mulder, Esther)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Court's Order issued Dec 6, 2019, served on Elmer Miller on Dec 10, 2019, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Mulder, Esther)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH SUBPOENAS OR SHOW CAUSE entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/6/2019. Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2019. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
December 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held 12/6/19 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance on behalf of petitioner by Esther Mulder. No appearance of respondent. Clerk attempted to contact respondent with no success. Status Conference held by telephone. Status of the case discussed. Respondent has 7 days to comply with the administrative subpoena. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-B 10:36 AM.) (SKR, ilcd)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Secretary's Petition w/exhibits, Memo, Proposed Order served on Elmer Miller on 11.21.19, filed by Eugene Scalia. (Mulder, Esther)
November 22, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/6/19 at 10:15 AM by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (TC, ilcd)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/22/19. A telephone status conference with the Petitioner is set for 12/6/19 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (TC, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in Support re Secretary of Labor's #1 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas filed by Petitioner Eugene Scalia. (KM, ilcd)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Administrative Subpoenas Issued by OSHA with Exhibits by Petitioner Eugene Scalia. Responses due by 12/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Christine Z Heri
Represented By: Esther E Mulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Elmer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?