Jarvis v. Dick's Sporting Goods Inc et al
Plaintiff: Brad Jarvis
Defendant: Ravin Crossbows LLC and Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02009
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 24 JUDGMENT entered. (SKR, ilcd)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 2/28/20. Motion to Remand #20 is withdrawn. This action is hereby Remanded to the Circuit Court for the Fifth Judicial Circuit,Vermilion County, Illinois. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR, ilcd)
February 27, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION Order to Cap Damages and Remand by Ravin Crossbows LLC.. (Brock, Steven)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/18/2020. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2020 is RESCHEDULED to 3/26/2020 10:45 AM in by telephone from Urbana (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long.(DS, ilcd)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff Brad Jarvis. (Lichtenberger, Todd)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Brad Jarvis. Responses due by 2/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichtenberger, Todd)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/4/20. This Court has reviewed the parties' Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #19 and the matter is hereby converted from personal appearance to telephone conference on 2/21/20 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (SKR, ilcd)
February 3, 2020 Filing 19 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Brad Jarvis. (Lichtenberger, Todd)
February 3, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Lichtenberger, Todd)
February 3, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brad Jarvis Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Lichtenberger, Todd)
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Todd D Lichtenberger on behalf of Brad Jarvis (Lichtenberger, Todd)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 for Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc. (Brock, Steven)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 for Ravin Crossbows, LLC by Ravin Crossbows LLC. (Brock, Steven)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods' ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Dick's Sporting Goods Inc.(Brock, Steven)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant Ravin Crossbows, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Ravin Crossbows LLC.(Brock, Steven)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven D Brock on behalf of All Defendants (Brock, Steven)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Barry Sutton on behalf of All Defendants (Sutton, Barry) Modified on 1/22/2020 Incorrectly filed; replaced by Notice of Appearance #11 . (KM, ilcd).
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Barry B Sutton on behalf of All Defendants (Sutton, Barry)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/17/20. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (SKR, ilcd)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Timothy Robert Herman on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Ravin Crossbows, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Daniel T Graham on behalf of Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Ravin Crossbows, LLC (Graham, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal (Graham, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 Exhibit re #1 Notice of Removal by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (Graham, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibit B by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (Graham, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit re #1 Notice of Removal by Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc., Ravin Crossbows, LLC. (Graham, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Vermilion County Circuit Court, case number 19-L-60 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3283320), filed by Ravin Crossbows, LLC, Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc..(Graham, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarvis v. Dick's Sporting Goods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravin Crossbows LLC
Represented By: Daniel T Graham
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods Inc
Represented By: Daniel T Graham
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Jarvis
Represented By: Todd D Lichtenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?