Newman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Grace H Newman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02039
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Grace H Newman as to Commissioner of Social Security 3/10/2020. (serving Attorney General) (SKR, ilcd)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lindsay Beyer Payne on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Payne, Lindsay)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JMB, ilcd)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/24/2020 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See written order. (JMB, ilcd)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Todd D Lichtenberger on behalf of Grace H Newman (SKR, ilcd) Modified on 2/21/2020 to correct filing date (SKR, ilcd).
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Grace H Newman. Responses due by 3/5/2020 (SKR, ilcd)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Grace H Newman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Regional Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney, #5 USM 285 Attorney General)(SKR, ilcd) Modified on 2/21/2020 to correct filing date (SKR, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lindsay Beyer Payne
Represented By: US ATTY-URBANA SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace H Newman
Represented By: Todd D Lichtenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?