Monterosso v. Receivables Management Partners LLC
Plaintiff: Marie Monterosso
Defendant: Receivables Management Partners LLC and Receivables Management Partners LLC doing business as RMP Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02185
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/20/2020. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Amended General Order 20-01, In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency, the court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/20 at 10:45 AM. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #10 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 9/16/20, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 9/30/20, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 2/17/21, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 3/3/21, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 2/24/21, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 3/10/21, discovery closes 5/12/21, case dispositive motions due 8/11/21. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/22 at 11:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 2/1/22 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 11/9/20 at 10:30 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The Court will initiate the call. (DS, ilcd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Marie Monterosso. (Taylor, Alexander)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Receivables Management Partners LLC.(Manetti, Louis)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/27/2020. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 8/26/2020 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (DS, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/27/2020. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #7 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 8/17/20. (DS, ilcd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) by Defendant Receivables Management Partners LLC. Responses due by 8/7/2020 (Manetti, Louis)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Louis Joseph Manetti, Jr on behalf of Receivables Management Partners LLC (Manetti, Louis)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David M Schultz on behalf of Receivables Management Partners LLC (Schultz, David)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marie Monterosso. Receivables Management Partners LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Taylor, Alexander)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Receivables Management Partners LLC and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alexander James Taylor on behalf of Marie Monterosso (Taylor, Alexander)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Receivables Management Partners, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3412056.), filed by Marie Monterosso. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Taylor, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterosso v. Receivables Management Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Monterosso
Represented By: Alexander James Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Management Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivables Management Partners LLC doing business as RMP Services LLC
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Louis Joseph Manetti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?