Hernandez v. Brannon
Petitioner: Daniel Belman Hernandez
Respondent: Christine Brannon
Interested Party: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2020cv02190
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626037933. (JS, ilcd)
July 8, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 1:20-cv-03977, filed 07/08/2020. (KM, ilcd)
July 7, 2020 Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. This case is terminated. (DS, ilcd)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/7/2020. The court has reviewed the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Petitioner in this case. Petitioner's conviction originated in Kane County, Illinois, which is located in the Northern District of Illinois. Therefore, the clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District. (DS, ilcd)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5.00; received), filed by Daniel Belman Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(DS, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christine Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Belman Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?