Maggio v. Dennison
Petitioner: Brian Maggio
Respondent: Jeff Dennison
Not Classified By Court: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2020cv02195
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT entered. (DS, ilcd)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/21/2020. Petitioner's Petition #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Petitioner's Motion #2 is DENIED AS MOOT. This case is terminated. See written Order. (DS, ilcd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Rescind Extension of Time as Premature by Petitioner Brian Maggio. Responses due by 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(DS, ilcd)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 7/8/2020. Petitioner mailed a document to this court on June 30, 2020, which was received on July 6, 2020, and entered on the docket on July 8, 2020, which is construed by the court as a combined Petition and Motion for Extension of time. Due to the highly unusual circumstances of the novel coronavirus pandemic, the extension of time Petitioner seeks is reasonable. Petitioner is therefore granted an extension of time. Petitioner must file an Amended Petition within 21 days, which must include the relevant information he has at this time. If some information is unavailable to Petitioner and Petitioner needs more time to get that information he may file a motion for leave to file a Second Amended Petition at the same time he files his Amended Petition, and tell the court how much time he needs to file his Second Amended Petition. Petitioner must also submit, along with his Amended Petition, the $5.00 filing fee or an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis accompanied by a copy of his Prison Trust Fund Ledger. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2020.)(DS, ilcd)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus including motion for extension of time to file by Brian Maggio.(KM, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maggio v. Dennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Dennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?