Cox v. Rietz et al
Plaintiff: Derick A Cox
Defendant: Kirstin Alferink and Julia Rietz
Case Number: 2:2020cv02216
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/9/2020. On August 18, 2020, the Court received mail returned to it, as undeliverable, that it had sent to Plaintiff at the Champaign County Jail. Thereafter, the Court re-sent the undelivered mail to Plaintiff and warned him that, unless he complied with Local Rule 16.3(K) and provided his current address in writing to the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days, the Court would dismiss this case. As of today, the Court has received more mail that it sent to Plaintiff returned as undeliverable, and Plaintiff has not updated his current address as required by Local Rule 16.3(K) and the Court's Order. Local Rule 16.3(K) requires every pro se plaintiff to inform the Court of any change of address that occurs during the pendency of his case. Failure to comply with this Local Rule results in the dismissal of the case. Id. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE based upon Plaintiff's failure to comply with Local Rule 16.3(K) and with the Court's Orders. No judgment to enter. (KE, ilcd)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re #10 . Mail sent to Plaintiff at Champaign County Jail (JMB, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/18/2020. Court docket entry #7 , #8 , #9 sent to plaintiff Derick A Cox has been returned as undeliverable. Within 14 days of the entry of this order, plaintiff is directed to show good cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to keep the Court informed of plaintiff's address. Failure to show good cause will result in dismissal of this case. (KE, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Kirstin Alferink on 8/10/2020. (KE, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/10/2020. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/10/2020. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Complaint states a claim for malicious prosecution against Defendant Kirstin Alferink. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the Court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. The Clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The Clerk is directed to attempt service on Defendant Alferink pursuant to the Court's standard procedures. The Clerk is further directed to dismiss Defendant Rietz because Plaintiff's Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted against her. 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915A; Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6). Finally, Plaintiff must pay the initial, partial filing fee of $1.67 that the Court imposed in this case. Plaintiff should pay this fee within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to timely pay this fee, the Court will dismiss this case. See written order. (KE, ilcd)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/3/2020. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.67. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (KE, ilcd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Derick A Cox. (KE, ilcd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of the Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (KE, ilcd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Derick A Cox. (KE, ilcd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Derick A Cox.(KE, ilcd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Colin Stirling Bruce. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Derick A Cox. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KE, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Rietz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick A Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstin Alferink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Rietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?