Harms v. Kankakee Community College et al
Plaintiff: Alyssia Harms
Defendant: Kankakee Community College, AMITA Health St. Mary's Hospital Kankakee, Amita Health doing business as AMITA Health St. Mary's Hospital Kankakee and Presence Central & Suburban Hospitals Network doing business as Amita Health St. Mary's Hospital Kankakee
Case Number: 2:2020cv02281
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Julie A Monroe on behalf of Amita Health (Monroe, Julie)
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Andre Wilder on behalf of Amita Health (Wilder, Michael)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssia Harms. Presence Central & Suburban Hospitals Network served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Mollica, Paul)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssia Harms. Amita Health served on 11/18/2020, answer due 12/9/2020. (Mollica, Paul)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Susan E Nicholas on behalf of Kankakee Community College (Nicholas, Susan)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Todd Kenneth Hayden on behalf of Kankakee Community College (Hayden, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jessica A Milligan on behalf of Kankakee Community College (Milligan, Jessica)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alyssia Harms. Kankakee Community College waiver sent on 10/14/2020, answer due 12/14/2020. (Mollica, Paul)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Presence on 10/14/2020. (Mollica, Paul)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to AMITA on 10/14/2020. (Mollica, Paul)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Presence Central & Suburban Hospitals Network and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
October 12, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Alyssia Harms against All Defendants, filed by Alyssia Harms. (Attachments: #1 Summons Presence)(Mollica, Paul)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AMITA Health St. Mary's Hospital Kankakee, Kankakee Community College and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Alyssia Harms against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3493850.), filed by Alyssia Harms. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Summons KCC, #4 Summons AMITA, #5 Appearance of Paul W. Mollica, #6 Appearance of Laura J. Miller)(Mollica, Paul) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/9/2020) (DS, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harms v. Kankakee Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kankakee Community College
Represented By: Todd Kenneth Hayden
Represented By: Jessica A Milligan
Represented By: Susan E Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMITA Health St. Mary's Hospital Kankakee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amita Health doing business as AMITA Health St. Mary's Hospital Kankakee
Represented By: Michael Andre Wilder
Represented By: Julie A Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presence Central & Suburban Hospitals Network doing business as Amita Health St. Mary's Hospital Kankakee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssia Harms
Represented By: Paul W Mollica
Represented By: Laura J Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?