Byrider Franchising LLC v. Drake Automotive Inc et al
Plaintiff: Byrider Franchising LLC
Defendant: Blake Johnson, Drake Holdings Inc, Drew Johnson and Drake Automotive Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02360
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/8/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Drake Automotive Inc, Drake Holdings Inc, Blake Johnson, Drew Johnson. (Postlewait, R)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Drake Automotive Inc, Drake Holdings Inc, Blake Johnson, Drew Johnson.(Postlewait, R)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Drake Automotive Inc, Drake Holdings Inc, Blake Johnson, Drew Johnson and returned to counsel for service. (DS, ilcd)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Aaron-Michael Hanchett Sapp on behalf of Byrider Franchising, LLC (Sapp, Aaron-Michael)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0753-3548509.), filed by Byrider Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note)(Sapp, Aaron-Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (DS, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrider Franchising LLC v. Drake Automotive Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Johnson
Represented By: R Samuel Postlewait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Holdings Inc
Represented By: R Samuel Postlewait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Johnson
Represented By: R Samuel Postlewait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Automotive Inc
Represented By: R Samuel Postlewait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byrider Franchising LLC
Represented By: Aaron-Michael Hanchett Sapp
Represented By: Fredric A Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?