Hammerslough v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joseph S Hammerslough
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv02081
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Joseph S Hammerslough as to Commissioner of Social Security - Attorney General on 5/17/2021. (BMG)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/29/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JMB)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/29/2021. Plaintiff's Amended Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees #2 is GRANTED. See written order. (JMB)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph S. Hammerslough. Responses due by 5/12/2021 (Hanrahan, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2021: #1 Summons Attorney General Corrected, #2 Summons Office of Regional Counsel Corrected, #3 Summons US Atty Corrected) (JMB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2021: #4 USM285) (JMB).
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Joseph S. Hammerslough. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Rule 11.3 certification, #3 U.S. Attorney Summons, #4 Regional Counsel Summons, #5 Summons Attorney General)(Hanrahan, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammerslough v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-URBANA SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph S Hammerslough
Represented By: Donald J Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?