Flowers v. Officer No. 1 et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Flowers
Defendant: Officer No. 2, Officer No. 4, Officer No. 3 and Officer No. 1
Case Number: 2:2021cv02102
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: James E Shadid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court re: filing fee filed by Benjamin Flowers. (VH)
June 28, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 14626041000 (AEM)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (JS)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 6/3/2021. The pro se Plaintiff has filed a complaint and a motion to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) #1 , #3 . Plaintiff notes in his IFP motion that he has received money from friends and currently has $2,500 in his account #3 . Plaintiff's Trust Fund Account further confirms Plaintiff has a steady income and as of May 11, 2021, had a total of $2,378 available. The Court notes a filing fee must be paid from income from any source including gifts. See Lucien v. DeTella, 141 F.3d 773, 776 (7th Cir.1998); Bates v. Thompson, 2000 WL 1117869, at *1 (7th Cir. 2000). Therefore, Plaintiff's IFP motion is denied #3 . Plaintiff must pay the full $402 filing fee within 21 days or on or before 6/24/2021 or his case will be dismissed. (SAG)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Benjamin Flowers (FDS)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court to Sheridan CC Trust Fund Dept. requesting ledgers 11/12/20 through 5/12/21 (SAG)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge James Shadid. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division, 100 NE Monroe Street, Peoria, IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Benjamin Flowers. Responses due by 5/26/2021 (SAG)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Benjamin Flowers.(SAG)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benjamin Flowers.(SAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Officer No. 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer No. 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?