Willis et al v. Weasler Engineering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tony Willis and Alisa Willis
Defendant: Weasler Engineering, Inc. and Weasler Engineering Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv02106
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Weasler Engineering Inc. (Chapski, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Weasler Engineering Inc.(Chapski, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joshua Lee Johanningmeier on behalf of Weasler Engineering Inc (Johanningmeier, Joshua)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/7/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 8/12/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert Francis Chapski on behalf of Weasler Engineering Inc (Chapski, Robert)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Weasler Engineering Inc, returned to Plaintiff counsel for service. (BMG)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Weasler Engineering, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3667428.), filed by Tony Willis, Alisa Willis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet, #2 Summons for Weasler Engineering, Inc.)(Jenkins, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis et al v. Weasler Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Willis
Represented By: William Lewis Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Willis
Represented By: William Lewis Jenkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weasler Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weasler Engineering Inc
Represented By: Robert Francis Chapski
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?