Davenport v. Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert B Davenport
Defendant: Midstate Collection Solutions Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv02182
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Following Report of Settlement entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/8/2021. The parties are directed to file a stipulation for dismissal within 35 days of the date of this order. See written Order. (Settlement Papers deadline set for 10/13/2021).(BMG)
September 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Notice of Settlement (Kern, Joseph)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/1/21. Defendant's Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #10 is GRANTED. The new deadline for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment #6 is September 7, 2021. (BMG)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Agreed) by Defendant Midstate Collection Solutions Inc. Responses due by 9/7/2021 (Kern, Joseph)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/25/21. Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #9 is GRANTED. The new deadline for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #6 is August 31, 2021. (BMG)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Agreed) by Defendant Midstate Collection Solutions Inc. Responses due by 8/31/2021 (Kern, Joseph)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/10/2021. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/21. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #7 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 8/13/21, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 1/1/22, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 1/7/22, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 1/14/22, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 2/11/22, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 2/18/22, discovery closes 3/31/22, case dispositive motions due 4/29/22. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/22 at 3:00 PM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 9/27/22 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 11/10/21 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 571-353-2300, then enter 068715238#. If the prior conference has not finished, please mute your line while you wait for your case to be called. (BMG)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Midstate Collection Solutions Inc. (Kern, Joseph)
August 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pro Se Plaintiff Robert B Davenport. Responses due by 8/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proof of Service)(BMG)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Midstate Collection Solutions Inc.(Kern, Joseph)
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph D Kern on behalf of Midstate Collection Solutions Inc (Kern, Joseph)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/16/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 8/19/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David M Schultz on behalf of Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. (Schultz, David)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit, Champaign County, Illinois, case number 2021SC000598 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3711750), filed by Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, page 1 cover sheet, pages 2-3 State Court Complaint, pages 4-11 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, David) Modified on 7/16/21 to itemize Exhibit A (TC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midstate Collection Solutions Inc
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Joseph D Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?