Snyder v Archer Daniels Midland et al
Plaintiff: Deandra Snyder
Defendant: Archer Daniels Midland Company and Vantage Corn Processors, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02224
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Archer Daniels Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC. (Clarke, Ariel)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 10/4/2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/28/2021 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Defendants Archer Daniels Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC. (Clarke, Ariel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Archer Daniels Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC.(Clarke, Ariel)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 9/24/2021. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #9 is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 10/1/21. (JMB)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Archer Daniels Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2021 (Clarke, Ariel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Ariel Clarke on behalf of Archer Daniels Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC (Clarke, Ariel)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jody A Boquist on behalf of Archer Daniels Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC (Boquist, Jody)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deandra Snyder. Vantage Corn Processors, LLC served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Wood, James)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deandra Snyder. Archer Daniels Midland Company served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Wood, James)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Terri Blanchard on behalf of Deandra Snyder (Blanchard, Terri)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Archer Daniels Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James Bryan Wood on behalf of Deandra Snyder (Wood, James)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-3742434.), filed by Deandra Snyder, Archer-Daniels-Midland Company, Vantage Corn Processors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Deandra Snyder Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, James) Modified on 8/24/2021 to show the correct document titled. (JMB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v Archer Daniels Midland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandra Snyder
Represented By: James Bryan Wood
Represented By: Terri Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archer Daniels Midland Company
Represented By: Jody A Boquist
Represented By: Ariel Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Corn Processors, LLC
Represented By: Jody A Boquist
Represented By: Ariel Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?