Hancock v. Mascal et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence L Hancock and Romeo L Earving
Defendant: Kevin Mascal, Dale Talbit and William Anthony Harris
Case Number: 2:2021cv02286
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lawrence L Hancock. Responses due by 1/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 envelope)(RES)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 12/23/2021. Because Plaintiff is out of custody, the Court requires additional information to rule upon his request to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is DENIED with leave to renew. Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the long-form IFP form. Plaintiff shall complete the form and file it with the Court or pay the $402.00 filing fee in full within 21 days of this Order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. (KB)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Lawrence L Hancock. Responses due by 12/3/2021 (KE)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Lawrence L Hancock.(KE)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 322 16th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lawrence L Hancock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(KE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hancock v. Mascal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence L Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo L Earving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Talbit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Anthony Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?