Del Carmens West LLC v. The Original Del Carmens Pizza LLC
Plaintiff: Del Carmens West LLC
Counter Defendant: Del Carmen's West LLC
Counter Claimant: The Original Del Carmen's LLC and The Original Del Carmens Pizza LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02066
Filed: March 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2023 Filing 16 Letter to counsel from Judge Long regarding settlement conference. (DS)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/25/2023. A Settlement Conference is set for 7/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. A Presettlement Conference with Plaintiff's counsel is set for 7/11/2023 at 10:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. A Presettlement Conference with Defendant's counsel is set for 7/11/2023 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Confidential settlement letters due 7/7/2023. See written Order. (DS)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/25/2023. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #11 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 5/31/23, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 6/30/23, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 9/29/23, Plaintiff shall make experts available for deposition by 12/15/23, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 1/31/24, Defendant shall make experts available for deposition by 3/15/24, discovery closes 10/6/23, case dispositive motions due 4/15/24. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. (DS)
April 24, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant The Original Del Carmens Pizza LLC. (Phillips, Jonathan)
April 24, 2023 Filing 12 MINUTES for proceedings held 4/24/23 before Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance for Plaintiff by Jerrold Stocks. Appearance for Defendant by Jonathan Phillips. Rule 16 conference held in person. Plan to be filed after today's hearing and will be considered by the Court. Parties request settlement conference; dates set. Trial date may be set after the settlement conference if needed. Written order to be entered. Magistrate Consent Form attached for parties. (Tape #UR-B 9:43 AM.) (DS)
April 24, 2023 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by The Original Del Carmens Pizza LLC. (Phillips, Jonathan)
April 11, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Del Carmen's West LLC, Counter Defendant Del Carmen's West LLC. Responses due by 4/25/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Supplement)(Sullivan, Patrick)
April 11, 2023 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Del Carmen's West LLC. (Sullivan, Patrick)
April 11, 2023 Filing 8 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Del Carmen's West LLC. (Sullivan, Patrick)
April 11, 2023 Filing 7 Counterclaim ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Del Carmen's West LLC.(Sullivan, Patrick)
April 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Patrick Sullivan on behalf of Del Carmen's West LLC (Sullivan, Patrick)
April 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jerrold H Stocks on behalf of Del Carmen's West LLC (Stocks, Jerrold)
April 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John T.D. Bathke on behalf of The Original Del Carmen's LLC (Bathke, John)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 3/22/2023. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 4/24/2023 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (DS)
March 21, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM S against Del Carmen's West, LLC by The Original Del Carmen's, LLC.(Phillips, Jonathan)
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit, Macon County, Illinois, case number 2022MR427 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4163587), filed by The Original Del Carmen's, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint)(Phillips, Jonathan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2023) (DS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Carmens West LLC v. The Original Del Carmens Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Del Carmen's West LLC
Represented By: Jerrold H Stocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: The Original Del Carmen's LLC
Represented By: Jonathan LA Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: The Original Del Carmens Pizza LLC
Represented By: Jonathan LA Phillips
Represented By: John T.D. Bathke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Del Carmens West LLC
Represented By: Jerrold H Stocks
Represented By: Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?