Lincoln Diagnostics Inc v. Lincoln Diagnostics LLC
Plaintiff: Lincoln Diagnostics Inc
Defendant: Lincoln Diagnostics LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv02107
Filed: May 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 35 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Concerning Production of Electronically Stored Information by Lincoln Diagnostics Inc.. (Cooperman, Marc)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/28/2023. Defendant's Motion to Stay #24 is DENIED. The deadlines set by this Court on July 11, 2023, remain in place. See written order. (JMB)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/28/2023. The Joint Motion for Extension of Time #33 is GRANTED. The parties' deadline to file their proposed ESI Production Protocol is extended to 9/8/23. (JMB)
August 25, 2023 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File ESI Production Protocol by Plaintiff Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. Responses due by 9/8/2023 (Cooperman, Marc)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/18/2023. See written order. (JMB)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/18/2023. Defendant did not file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order #29 . Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(B), the Court presumes there is no opposition and may rule without further notice. Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order #29 is GRANTED. (JMB)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 8/16/2023. The Court directs Plaintiff to send a Word version of its final Proposed Protective Order to Judge Long's chambers at long@ilcd.uscourts.gov. (JMB)
August 11, 2023 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. (Bagley, Mark) Modified on 8/23/2023 to show the correct title to the document. (JMB).
August 7, 2023 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Plaintiff Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cooperman, Marc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. Responses due by 8/14/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Cooperman, Marc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1)(A). (Cooperman, Marc)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin S. Bruce on 7/27/2023. The Consent Motion for Leave to File Reply #27 is GRANTED. Defendant's Reply brief is due August 10, 2023. (JMB)
July 26, 2023 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. Responses due by 8/9/2023 (Bagley, Mark)
July 25, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Plaintiff Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas S. Hein, #2 Declaration of Erik Maurer, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Maurer, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Maurer, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Maurer, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Maurer, #7 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Maurer, #8 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Maurer, #9 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Maurer, #10 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Maurer (part 1), #11 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Maurer (part 2), #12 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Maurer, #13 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Maurer, #14 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Maurer, #15 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Maurer, #16 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Maurer, #17 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Maurer, #18 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Maurer, #19 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Maurer)(Cooperman, Marc)
July 24, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. (Bagley, Mark)
July 24, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. Responses due by 8/7/2023 (Bagley, Mark)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/11/2023. The court hereby vacates the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/23. The court adopts the deadlines in the Parties' Agreed Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting #22 . The following deadlines are set: initial disclosures due 7/31/23, amended pleadings and joinder of parties due 10/13/23, fact discovery closes 3/15/24, Plaintiff's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 5/10/24, Defendant's deadline to disclose experts and provide expert reports is 6/7/24, reply expert reports due 7/12/24, all discovery, including deposition of experts, due by 8/16/24, case dispositive motions due 9/27/24. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/25 at 10:30 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. Jury Trial set for 2/18/25 at 9:00 AM, before Judge Colin S. Bruce, Courtroom A, Urbana. The court stresses the importance of adhering to the schedule and procedures for requests to extend the schedule. The parties are reminded of option of Court sponsored mediation/Settlement Conference. The Court directs the Clerk to provide the parties with a copy of the Court's consent to magistrate judge form. A telephone status conference is set for 3/11/24 at 10:45 AM, before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. The call-in number is 551-285-1373, then enter meeting ID 160 924 96574.(JMB)
July 10, 2023 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. (Cooperman, Marc)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin S. Bruce on 7/10/2023. Plaintiff's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response #21 is GRANTED. Plaintiff has until July 25, 2023, to file its Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.
July 7, 2023 Filing 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. Responses due by 7/21/2023 (Cooperman, Marc)
June 30, 2023 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. (Bagley, Mark)
June 30, 2023 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #18 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. (Bagley, Mark)
June 30, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. (Bagley, Mark)
June 30, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2023 (Bagley, Mark)
June 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Heather Smith-Carra on behalf of Lincoln Diagnostics Inc (Smith-Carra, Heather)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/12/2023. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2023 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written order. (JMB)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 6/12/2023. Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #14 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 6/30/23. (JMB)
June 9, 2023 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Lincoln Diagnostics LLC. Responses due by 6/23/2023 (Bagley, Mark)
June 9, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Mark Bagley on behalf of Lincoln Diagnostics LLC (Bagley, Mark)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark by Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. (JMB)
June 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christian T. Wolfgram on behalf of Lincoln Diagnostics Inc (Wolfgram, Christian)
May 22, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. Lincoln Diagnostics LLC served on 5/18/2023, answer due 6/8/2023. (Cooperman, Marc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 9 Alias Summons Issued as to Lincoln Diagnostics LLC and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 5/17/2023. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Deadline to Answer Complaint and Issue Alias Summons #7 is GRANTED. Defendant's 6/2/23 deadline to respond to the Complaint is stricken. The Clerk is directed to sign and issue the alias summons in a civil action attached as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs Motion. (JMB)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David A Rolf on behalf of Lincoln Diagnostics Inc (Rolf, David)
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike Deadline to Answer Complaint and Issue Alias Summons by Plaintiff Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. Responses due by 5/30/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Alias Summons, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cooperman, Marc)
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lincoln Diagnostics Inc. Lincoln Diagnostics LLC served on 5/12/2023, answer due 6/2/2023. (Cooperman, Marc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Diagnostics LLC and mailed to counsel for the Plaintiff for service. (JMB)
May 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Erik S Maurer on behalf of Lincoln Diagnostics, Inc. (Maurer, Erik)
May 10, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Lincoln Diagnostics, Inc.. (Cooperman, Marc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Marc S Cooperman on behalf of Lincoln Diagnostics, Inc. (Cooperman, Marc)
May 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Diagnostics, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4204071.), filed by Lincoln Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Cooperman, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lincoln Diagnostics Inc v. Lincoln Diagnostics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln Diagnostics Inc
Represented By: Erik S Maurer
Represented By: Marc S Cooperman
Represented By: Christian T. Wolfgram
Represented By: David A Rolf
Represented By: Heather Smith-Carra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Diagnostics LLC
Represented By: Mark Bagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?