Neff v. Champaign Unit 4 School District
Plaintiff: Deborah Neff
Defendant: Champaign Unit 4 School District
Case Number: 2:2023cv02205
Filed: September 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Eric I Long
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/7/23 setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 12/13/23 at 9:45 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. If an agreed discovery plan is filed 7 days before the hearing, the Court will adopt the schedule and vacate the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. See written Order for other directives. (TC)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 11/7/2023. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #7 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 12/7/23. (TC)
November 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - UNOPPOSED by Defendant Champaign Unit 4 School District. Responses due by 11/20/2023 (Kane, Caroline)
November 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Caroline K Kane on behalf of Champaign Unit 4 School District (Kane, Caroline)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Neff. Champaign Unit 4 School District served on 10/17/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. (Volheim, Nathan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Champaign Unit 4 School District and returned to counsel for service. (DS)
September 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Travis Phillip Lampert on behalf of Deborah Neff (Lampert, Travis)
September 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of Deborah Neff (Volheim, Nathan)
September 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Champaign Unit 4 School District ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILCDC-4304011.), filed by Deborah Neff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neff v. Champaign Unit 4 School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Neff
Represented By: Travis Phillip Lampert
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champaign Unit 4 School District
Represented By: Caroline K Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?