Spire STL Pipeline LLC v Betty Ann Jefferson et al
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: Laura Jane Dukett, Hart Farms, LLC, 5.05 acres more or less, Betty Ann Jefferson, Greg Steckel, 7.07 acres more or less, Kenneth W. Davis, Phillip E. Tepen, 4.21 acres more or less, 3.49 acres more or less, 7.13 acres more or less, Unknown Owners, William D. & Alice E Ballard, The First National Bank of Arenzville, 7.09 acres more or less, 10.25 acres more or less, 7.15 acres more or less, 2.22 acres more or less, Anne M. Clayton, 3.59 acres more or less, Mark A. Ryan, 12.61 acres more or less, 5.07 acres more or less, Gayle P. Willis, CNB Bank & Trust N.A., 3.47 acres more or less, Farmers State Bank, 1.89 acres more or less, 2.81 acres more or less, Michael Dahman, Jonathon Esarey, 4.08 acres more or less, Richard Keith Jefferson, 2.63 acres more or less, Le Esarey Perry, United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service, Mark D. Steckel, Bernard H. Meyer, 13.31 acres more or less, 5.04 acres more or less, 2.90 acres more or less, Phillip L. Brown, Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield, 3.53 acres more or less, 7.24 acres more or less, 3.64 acres more or less, Forrest Neal Jones, 3.60 acres more or less, Elizabeth A. Tepen, Matthew J. Clayton, Mary Lois Meyer, 3.36 acres more or less, Michael A. Tepen, 5.56 acres more or less, S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C., Justus Esarey, Gerald Scott Turman, White Hall Bank, 7.09 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-068.000, 7.07 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-003.000, 5.05 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-120.000, 3.47 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-091.000, 2.81 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-029.000, 7.07 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-065.000, 3.34 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-018.000, 7.15 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-117.000, 2.90 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-008.000, 5.04 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-022.000, 2.22 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-007.000, 3.59 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-121.000, 4.21 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-116.000, Zena B. Brown, 4.08 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-011.000, 7.24 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-111.000, Kenneth R. Willis, 13.31 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-110.000, 1.89 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-030.000, 2.63 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-041.001, 3.49 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-063.000, 3.64 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-008.001, 3.53 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-094.000, 12.61 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-080.100, 5.07 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-009.000, 3.60 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-078.000, 4.21 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-093.000, 7.13 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-092.000, 3.37 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-.019.000 and 10.25 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-112.000
Case Number: 3:2018cv03204
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Office: Springfield Office
County: Scott
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 43:945a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 MOTION Motion to Confirm Condemnation filed by Defendants William D. & Alice E Ballard, Phillip L. Brown, Zena B. Brown, Anne M. Clayton, Matthew J. Clayton, Kenneth W. Davis, Laura Jane Dukett, Jonathon Esarey, Justus Esarey, Hart Farms, LLC, Betty Ann Jefferson, Richard Keith Jefferson, Forrest Neal Jones, Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield, Bernard H. Meyer, Mary Lois Meyer, Le Esarey Perry, Mark A. Ryan, S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C., Greg Steckel, Mark D. Steckel, Gerald Scott Turman, Gayle P. Willis, Kenneth R. Willis. (Kellett, Christopher)
October 4, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Christopher P Kellett on behalf of William D. & Alice E Ballard, Phillip L. Brown, Zena B. Brown, Anne M. Clayton, Matthew J. Clayton, Kenneth W. Davis, Laura Jane Dukett, Jonathon Esarey, Justus Esarey, Hart Farms, LLC, Betty Ann Jefferson, Richard Keith Jefferson, Forrest Neal Jones, Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield, Bernard H. Meyer, Mary Lois Meyer, Le Esarey Perry, Mark A. Ryan, S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C., Greg Steckel, Mark D. Steckel, Gerald Scott Turman, Gayle P. Willis, Kenneth R. Willis (Kellett, Christopher)
September 28, 2018 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Confirm Condemnation re #79 MOTION Motion to Confirm Condemnation by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Petrilli, Lisa)
September 28, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION Motion to Confirm Condemnation by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2018 (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 25, 2018 Filing 78 SERVICE by Publication filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Last publication date 9/5/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 25, 2018 Filing 77 SERVICE by Publication filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Last publication date 9/5/18. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 76 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to Michael Dahman. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 75 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to Michael Dahman. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 74 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to Michael Dahman. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 73 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to Michael Dahman 8/22/2018. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 72 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to The First National Bank of Arenzville 8/22/2018. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 71 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to White Hall Bank 8/21/2018. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 70 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to Farmers State Bank 8/22/2018. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 69 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to 4.21 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-093.000 8/28/2018. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 68 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to CNB Bank & Trust N.A.. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 67 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to CNB Bank & Trust N.A. 8/25/2018. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 66 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 65 Return of Service Executed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC as to United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service 8/16/2018. (Petrilli, Lisa)
September 7, 2018 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #63 is ALLOWED. Defendants William D. & Alice E Ballard, Phillip L. Brown, Zena B. Brown, Anne M. Clayton, Matthew J. Clayton, Kenneth W. Davis, Laura Jane Dukett, Jonathon Esarey, Justus Esarey, Hart Farms, LLC, Betty Ann Jefferson, Richard Keith Jefferson, Forrest Neal Jones, Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield, Bernard H. Meyer, Mary Lois Meyer, Le Esarey Perry, Mark A. Ryan, S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C., Greg Steckel, Mark D. Steckel, Gerald Scott Turman, Gayle P. Willis, and Kenneth R. Willis granted extension to 10/25/2018 to answer or otherwise plead. (LB, ilcd)
September 6, 2018 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by William D. & Alice E Ballard, Phillip L. Brown, Zena B. Brown, Anne M. Clayton, Matthew J. Clayton, Kenneth W. Davis, Laura Jane Dukett, Jonathon Esarey, Justus Esarey, Hart Farms, LLC, Betty Ann Jefferson, Richard Keith Jefferson, Forrest Neal Jones, Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield, Bernard H. Meyer, Mary Lois Meyer, Le Esarey Perry, Mark A. Ryan, S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C., Greg Steckel, Mark D. Steckel, Gerald Scott Turman, Gayle P. Willis, Kenneth R. Willis. (Schaeffer, Tyler)
September 6, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants William D. & Alice E Ballard, Phillip L. Brown, Zena B. Brown, Anne M. Clayton, Matthew J. Clayton, Kenneth W. Davis, Laura Jane Dukett, Jonathon Esarey, Justus Esarey, Hart Farms, LLC, Betty Ann Jefferson, Richard Keith Jefferson, Forrest Neal Jones, Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield, Bernard H. Meyer, Mary Lois Meyer, Le Esarey Perry, Mark A. Ryan, S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C., Greg Steckel, Mark D. Steckel, Gerald Scott Turman, Gayle P. Willis, Kenneth R. Willis. Responses due by 9/20/2018 (Schaeffer, Tyler)
September 6, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Tyler Charles Schaeffer on behalf of William D. & Alice E Ballard, Phillip L. Brown, Zena B. Brown, Anne M. Clayton, Matthew J. Clayton, Kenneth W. Davis, Laura Jane Dukett, Jonathon Esarey, Justus Esarey, Hart Farms, LLC, Betty Ann Jefferson, Richard Keith Jefferson, Forrest Neal Jones, Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield, Bernard H. Meyer, Mary Lois Meyer, Le Esarey Perry, Mark A. Ryan, S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C., Greg Steckel, Mark D. Steckel, Gerald Scott Turman, Gayle P. Willis, Kenneth R. Willis (Schaeffer, Tyler)
August 16, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (unknown owners) (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel by Publication by Lisa A Petrilli on behalf of Spire STL Pipeline LLC (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of commencement of condemnation action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of commencement of condemnation action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of commencement of condemnation action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Commencement of condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Aciton (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Commencement of Condemnation Action (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David A Rolf on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rolf, David)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Condemnation against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2904682.), filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 part 2 of Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, part 1, #4 Exhibit 1, part 2, #5 Exhibit 1, part 3, #6 Exhibit 2A, #7 Exhibit 2B, #8 Exhibit 3A, #9 Exhibit 3B, #10 Exhibit 4A, #11 Exhibit 4B, #12 Exhibit 5A, #13 Exhibit 5B, #14 Exhibit 6A, #15 Exhibit 6B, #16 Exhibit 7A, #17 Exhibit 7B, #18 Exhibit 8A, #19 Exhibit 8B, #20 Exhibit 9A, #21 Exhibit 9B, #22 Exhibit 10A, #23 Exhibit 10B, #24 Exhibit 11A, #25 Exhibit 11B, #26 Exhibit 12A, #27 Exhibit 12B, #28 Exhibit 13A, #29 Exhibit 13B, #30 Exhibit 14A, #31 Exhibit 14B, #32 Exhibit 15A, #33 Exhibit 15B, #34 Exhibit 16A, #35 Exhibit 16B, #36 Exhibit 17A, #37 Exhibit 17B, #38 Exhibit 18A, #39 Exhibit 18B, #40 Exhibit 19A, #41 Exhibit 19B, #42 Exhibit 20A, #43 Exhibit 20B, #44 Exhibit 21A, #45 Exhibit 21B, #46 Exhibit 22A, #47 Exhibit 22B, #48 Exhibit 23A, #49 Exhibit 23B, #50 Exhibit 24A, #51 Exhibit 24B, #52 Exhibit 25A, #53 Exhibit 25B, #54 Exhibit 26A, #55 Exhibit 26B, #56 Exhibit 27A, #57 Exhibit 27B, #58 Exhibit 28A, #59 Exhibit 28B, #60 Exhibit 29A, #61 Exhibit 29B)(Petrilli, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v Betty Ann Jefferson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Jane Dukett
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hart Farms, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.05 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Ann Jefferson
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Steckel
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.07 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth W. Davis
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip E. Tepen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.21 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.49 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.13 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. & Alice E Ballard
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First National Bank of Arenzville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.09 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10.25 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.15 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.22 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne M. Clayton
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.59 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Ryan
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12.61 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.07 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle P. Willis
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNB Bank & Trust N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.47 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers State Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.89 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.81 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Esarey
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.08 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Keith Jefferson
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.63 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Le Esarey Perry
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury-Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Steckel
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard H. Meyer
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13.31 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.04 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.90 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip L. Brown
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell L. and Jo Ann Mansfield
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.53 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.24 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.64 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Neal Jones
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.60 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Tepen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Clayton
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lois Meyer
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.36 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Tepen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.56 acres more or less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.T. Turman Contracting, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justus Esarey
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Scott Turman
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Hall Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.09 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-068.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.07 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-003.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.05 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-120.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.47 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-091.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.81 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-029.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.07 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-065.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.34 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-018.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.15 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-117.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.90 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-008.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.04 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-022.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.22 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-007.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.59 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-121.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.21 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-116.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zena B. Brown
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.08 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-011.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.24 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-111.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth R. Willis
Represented By: Christopher P Kellett
Represented By: Tyler Charles Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13.31 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-110.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.89 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-030.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.63 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-041.001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.49 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-063.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.64 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-008.001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.53 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-094.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12.61 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-080.100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5.07 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-009.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.60 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-078.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.21 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-093.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7.13 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-092.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.37 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-SC-.019.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10.25 acres more or less Tract No.: IL-GC-112.000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Lisa A Petrilli
Represented By: David A Rolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?