Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. County of Greene et al
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Defendant: Carrollton Township, Roodhouse Township, Kane Township, White Hall Township, David Marth, Greene County, Township of White Hall, Township of Roodhouse, County of Greene, Township of Kane and Township of Carrollton
Case Number: 3:2018cv03286
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal #25 . Accordingly, Count I of Plaintiff's Verified Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Counts II and III of the Verified Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Any pending motions are DENIED as MOOT, any pending deadlines are TERMINATED, and any scheduled settings are VACATED. This case is CLOSED. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 12/12/2018. (GL, ilcd)
December 10, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and Local Rule 11.4(A)(3) by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time #24 , to which Plaintiff does not object, is GRANTED. The deadlines for Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #5 , Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #9 , and Defendants' answers to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint #1 are extended to Monday, December 10, 2018. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 11/20/2018. (GL, ilcd) Modified on 12/7/2018 to correct a docket number listed in Text Order (SKN, ilcd).
November 19, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment and all Answers to Complaint by Defendants County of Greene, David Marth, Township of Carrollton, Township of Kane, Township of Roodhouse, Township of White Hall. Responses due by 12/3/2018 (Davis, Charles)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Andrew M Ramage on behalf of County of Greene, David Marth (Ramage, Andrew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Charles Yates Davis on behalf of County of Greene, David Marth (Davis, Charles)
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gregory C Ray on behalf of Township of Carrollton, Township of Kane, Township of Roodhouse, Township of White Hall (Ray, Gregory)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on David Marth on 11/7/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Roodhouse Township Supervisor on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kane Township Supervisor on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Roodhouse township Highway Commissioner on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Carrollton Township Highway Commissioner on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Carrollton Township Supervisor on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kane Township Highway Commission on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on White Hall Township Supervisor on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on White Hall Highway Commission on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Greene County CEO on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Greene County Chairman on 11/5/18, filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Responses due by 11/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Petrilli, Lisa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spire STL Pipeline LLC re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #6 MOTION for Leave to File an Oversized Memorandum, #7 Memorandum (Rolf, David)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibits Part 2, #3 Exhibits Part 3, #4 Exhibits Part 4)(GL, ilcd)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File an Oversized Memorandum by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Responses due by 11/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of the Moton for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A-7, Part 1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A-7, Part 2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A-7, Part 3, #12 Exhibit Exhibit A-7, Part 4, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D, #16 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Rolf, David)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Spire STL Pipeline LLC. Responses due by 11/20/2018 (Rolf, David)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Oversized Memorandum #6 is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession [6-1] and all exhibits attached to the memorandum. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 11/6/2018. (GL, ilcd)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Originals given to legal assistant from Sorling Northrup at counter to effectuate service. (GL, ilcd)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David A Rolf on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rolf, David)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Petrilli, Lisa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greene County, Kane Township, Carrollton Township, Roodhouse Township, White Hall Township, David Marth ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2965073.), filed by Spire STL Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 part 2, #4 Exhibit 1 part 3, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6)(Petrilli, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spire STL Pipeline LLC v. County of Greene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrollton Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roodhouse Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Hall Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marth
Represented By: Charles Yates Davis
Represented By: Andrew M Ramage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township of White Hall
Represented By: Gregory C Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township of Roodhouse
Represented By: Gregory C Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Greene
Represented By: Charles Yates Davis
Represented By: Andrew M Ramage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township of Kane
Represented By: Gregory C Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township of Carrollton
Represented By: Gregory C Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spire STL Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Lisa A Petrilli
Represented By: David A Rolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?