CGB Diversified Services, Inc. v. Froehling
Plaintiff: CGB Diversified Services, Inc.
Defendant: Arthur H. Froehling
Case Number: 3:2019cv03034
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively to Strike Counterclaims filed by Counter Claimant Arthur H. Froehling, Defendant Arthur H. Froehling. (Draper, Carl)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONCERNING CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN CASES INVOLVING INITIAL DISPOSITIVE MOTION entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #(1) Notice, #(2) Consent Form) (LB, ilcd)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively to Strike Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. (Leuin, Charles)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or Alternatively to Strike Counterclaims by Plaintiff CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Leuin, Charles)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Before the Court is the parties' Agreed Discovery Plan #15 (Plan). The following deadlines are set pursuant to the Plan: Initial Disclosures due by 4/26/2019; Fact Discovery due by 8/30/2019; Defendant Froehling will respond by 4/4/2019 to the discovery requests addressed in Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery #5 (Motion). Plaintiff's Motion #5 is DENIED as moot. The parties shall file a joint proposal on or before 8/30/2019 regarding expert discovery. Final pretrial conference and jury trial not set at this time. (LB, ilcd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. (Leuin, Charles)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT AGREED STANDSTILL ORDER UNREDACTED (SKN, ilcd)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED STANDSTILL ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 03/07/2019. (SKN, ilcd)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Agreed Standstill Order (proposed) by CGB Diversified Services, Inc... (Leuin, Charles)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against CGB Diversified Services, Inc. by Arthur H. Froehling.(Draper, Carl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Carl R Draper on behalf of Arthur H. Froehling (Draper, Carl)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter, Notice of Electronic Filing, Motion for Expedited Discovery, Memoraudum in Support of Motion served on Arthur H. Froehling on 2-27-19, filed by CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. (Leuin, Charles)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Elizabeth D Winiarski on behalf of CGB Diversified Services, Inc. (Winiarski, Elizabeth)
February 27, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Expedited Discovery #5 (Motion). Defendant has been served. Return of Service #7 . Defendant is ordered to file his response to the Motion by March 7, 2019. On or before, March 1, 2019, Plaintiff shall deliver a copy of this Text Order to Defendant or a person residing at the address where Defendant was served, 511 N. Third Street, Cissna Park, Illinois 60924. The Clerks Office is also directed to mail a copy of this Text Order to the above address where Defendant was served. (LB, ilcd)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. Arthur H. Froehling served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (Leuin, Charles)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiff CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. (Leuin, Charles)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Expedited Discovery by Plaintiff CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Leuin, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by J Reed Roesler on behalf of CGB Diversified Services, Inc. (Roesler, J)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Arthur H. Froehling. (SKN, ilcd)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. (Leuin, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arthur H. Froehling (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt #34626011102), filed by CGB Diversified Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Leuin, Charles) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/11/2019 with non editable pdf version of document), Receipt # added (SKN, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CGB Diversified Services, Inc. v. Froehling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGB Diversified Services, Inc.
Represented By: Charles B Leuin
Represented By: Elizabeth D Winiarski
Represented By: J Reed Roesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur H. Froehling
Represented By: Carl R Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?