Lallouz v. Faingold
Plaintiff: Ariella Lallouz
Defendant: Charles Faingold
Petitioner: Ariella Faingold
Respondent: Baruch Faingold
Interested Party: E.F.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03053
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Motion by Guardian Ad Litem for Extension of Time to File Report #18 , to which the parties do not object, is GRANTED. The GAL shall file the Report on or before May 14, 2019. Petitioner shall file a brief in support of her position on or before May 21, 2019. Respondent shall file a response on or before May 28, 2019. Petitioner shall file a reply on or before June 4, 2019. The hearing scheduled for May 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to Monday, June 10, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1 in Springfield before Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 4/15/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
April 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report by Interested Party E.F.. Responses due by 4/29/2019 (Kepner, Daniel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Continue Hearing Set for April 11, 2019 filed by Interested Party E.F.. (Kepner, Daniel)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Petitioner's Motion to Continue #15 , to which Respondent does not object, is GRANTED. The hearing scheduled for April 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to May 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is Courtroom 1 in Springfield before Judge Sue E. Myerscough. The GAL shall file a Report on or before April 16, 2019. Petitioner shall file a brief in support of her position on or before April 23, 2019. Respondent shall file a response on or before April 30, 2019. Petitioner shall file a reply on or before May 7, 2019. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 03/29/2019. (DM, ilcd)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Continue Hearing Set for April 11, 2019 filed by Respondent Baruch Faingold. (Wasser, Stanley)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Respondent shall file a response to Petitioner's Motion for Continuance #15 by 3:30 p.m. on Friday, March 29, 2019. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/29/2019. (GL, ilcd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Hearing Set for April 11, 2019 by Petitioner Ariella Lallouz. Responses due by 4/11/2019 (Bernick, Reuben)
March 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Reuben A Bernick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bernick, Reuben)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Respondent's Request for Leave to Take Child to Chicago #12 on March 29, 2019 through April 7, 2019, to which no timely objection has been made, is GRANTED. Respondent may take the Child to Chicago as detailed in the Request #12 and the sealed Supplement #13 . Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/27/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Wasser, Stanley)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Order Allowing Travel to Chicago by Respondent Baruch Faingold. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Wasser, Stanley)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Baruch Faingold.(Feldman, Howard)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/12/2019. The Court waives the security requirement in Rule 65(c). The Court appoints Attorney Daniel Kepner as Guardian Ad Litem (GAL) for the Child. The preliminary injunction shall remain in effect until a ruling on the merits of the Petition or order of the Court. The hearing on the Petition is set for April 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 in Springfield. The parties shall file memoranda in support of their respective positions by noon on April 3, 2019. Responses shall be filed by noon on April 5, 2019. The Guardian Ad Litem shall file a report by noon on April 1, 2019. The Order to Show Cause is VACATED. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER) (MAS, ilcd)
March 11, 2019 Receipt for Passports: Israel Passport No.22419086 as to minor child E.F. (Receipt No.34626011195); USA Passport No.530580943 as to minor child E.F. (Receipt No.34626011193); Israel Passport No.21013568 as to Baruch Faingold (Receipt No.34626011194); USA Passport No.597505275 as to Charles Becket Faingold (Receipt No.34626011196). All received by the Court on 3/11/2019 and placed in the Clerk's Office safe. (ME, ilcd)
March 11, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Petition Hearing set for 4/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 in Springfield before Judge Sue E. Myerscough. (DM, ilcd)
March 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue E. Myerscough: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 3/11/2019. Petitioner Ariella Lallouz present via video. Attorney Molshree Sharma present via video on behalf of Petitioner. Respondent Baruch Faingold present in person with counsel of record, Attorneys Howard Feldman and Stanley Wasser. As ordered, the minor child also present in Court. Positions stated. Order to enter. By agreement of parties, hearing set for Petitioner's Petition for Return of Minor Child in Accordance with Hague Convention (d/e #1 ) on April 10, 2019 at 10:00 AM before U.S. District Judge Sue E. Myerscough, Courtroom 1, Springfield. Attorney Daniel Kepner appointed as Guardian Ad Litem for minor child. Hearing adjourned. (Court Reporter KS.) (DM, ilcd)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (DM, ilcd)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ariella Lallouz. (MAS, ilcd)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stanley N Wasser on behalf of Baruch Faingold (Wasser, Stanley)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Howard W Feldman on behalf of Baruch Faingold (Feldman, Howard)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EMERGENCY TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Respondent and the Child appear at the hearing on March 11, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER.) Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/8/2019. (GL, ilcd)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Petitioner has orally requested a continuance of the Temporary Restraining Order hearing. That request is GRANTED. The Temporary Restraining set for Friday, March 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to Monday, March 11, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1 in Springfield before Judge Sue E. Myerscough. Petitioner is to effectuate service on Respondent of the Petition and notice of this hearing in advance of the hearing. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Text Order to Respondent at 3909 Stone Bridge, Springfield, IL 62711. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/6/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baruch Faingold and returned to Petitioner's counsel to effectuate servie. (ME, ilcd)
March 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue E. Myerscough: TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/5/2019. Attorney Molshree A. Sharma present via telephone on behalf of Petitioner. Court attempted to reach Respondent Faingold several times at the phone number provided by Petitioners counsel. Upon calling court to order, Clerk attempted to phone Respondent on the record. Court was unsuccessful in its attempts to connect telephonically to Respondent. Attorney Sharma advised that service has not been effectuated upon Respondent but will be attempted this date. Hearing set for Temporary Restraining Order on Friday, March 8, 2019 at 10:00 AM CST before Judge Sue E. Myerscough, Courtroom 1, Springfield. Petitioner's counsel to obtain certified copies of Court Judgment and Parenting Agreement, as well as certified copies of translation, and submit same to the Court. Discussion held regarding appearances at hearing. Petitioner and Petitioner's counsel may appear by video or in person but should inform the Courtroom Deputy. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #SP-1: 11:08 AM.) (DM, ilcd)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: On March 1, 2019, Petitioner Ariella Lalouz filed a verified Petition for Return of Minor Child in Accordance with the Hague Convention and Motion for Expedited Return and Hearing Instanter #1 against Respondent Baruch Faingold. Respondent has not yet been served. The Court sets this matter for a telephone conference on Tuesday, March 5, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Central Standard Time solely for the purpose of discussing the possible setting of temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction hearings. The Court will place the call. Petitioner to provide the Court with a telephone number for Respondent. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 3/4/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance of Molshree Sharma , filed by Ariella Lallouz.(Sharma, Molshree) Modified docket text on 3/4/2019 (ME, ilcd). (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/4/2019) (ME, ilcd). Modified on 3/6/2019 (MC, ilcd). Modified on 3/6/2019 (MC, ilcd).
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 BLANK Summons by Ariella Lallouz as to Defendant. (Sharma, Molshree) Docket text modified on 3/4/2019 from summons returned to executed to blank summons. (ME, ilcd).
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Return of Minor Child in Accordance with Hague Convention and Motion for Expedited Return and Hearing Instanter ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3048633.), filed by Ariella Lallouz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharma, Molshree) Docket text modified on 3/4/2019 from Complaint to Petition/Motion. (ME, ilcd). Modified on 3/11/2019--Exhibit C sealed (DM, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lallouz v. Faingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariella Lallouz
Represented By: Molshree A Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Faingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Baruch Faingold
Represented By: Howard W Feldman
Represented By: Stanley N Wasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: E.F.
Represented By: Daniel E Kepner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ariella Faingold
Represented By: Molshree A Sharma
Represented By: Reuben A Bernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?