Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Darrel L Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSAOGC and CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv03081
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrel L Johnson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/30/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Drummond, Peter)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(SKN, ilcd)
April 1, 2019 Filing fee paid: $ 400.00, receipt number 34626011258. (SKN, ilcd)
March 29, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis #2 . Motion DENIED. Plaintiff has sufficient assets to pay the filing fee. Plaintiff directed to pay filing fee on or before April 29, 2019 or risk the dismissal of this case. (LB, ilcd)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Peter C Drummond on behalf of Darrel L Johnson (Drummond, Peter)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Darrel L Johnson. Responses due by 4/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Supplemental)(Drummond, Peter)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Darrel L Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Appeals Council Dec, #2 Unfavorable Dec, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Drummond, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel L Johnson
Represented By: Peter C Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?