Dunlevy v. Langfelder et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Dunlevy
Defendant: Doug Brown, John Davis, City of Springfield and James O. Langfelder
Case Number: 3:2019cv03093
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Andrew Dunlevy. (Baker, John)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 7/18/2019, at 9:30 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 7/16/2019. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to amended complaint by Doug Brown, City of Springfield, John Davis, James O. Langfelder.(Zimmerman, John)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint denominated in this Court's docket as "Amended Document" #11 . Plaintiff filed the Amended Complaint within the time allowed to file amended pleadings once without leave of Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). The Clerk is directed to correct the Court's docket to reflect that the Amended Document #11 is the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendants are directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by 6/14/2019. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 5/21/2019. (MAS, ilcd)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Andrew Dunlevy. First Amended Complaint. (Baker, John) Modified on 5/21/2019 (MAS, ilcd). Modified on 5/21/2019 to create relationship to Original Complaint(MAS, ilcd).
May 2, 2019 TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendants' Motion to Extend Time for Response to Plaintiff's Complaint #10 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 6/14/2019. (LB, ilcd)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Doug Brown, City of Springfield, John Davis, James O. Langfelder. Responses due by 5/14/2019 (Zimmerman, John)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Michael Zimmerman on behalf of All Defendants (Zimmerman, John)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven C Rahn on behalf of All Defendants (Rahn, Steven)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Dunlevy. All Defendants. (Baker, John)
April 10, 2019 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification regarding #1 Complaint: Clerk replaced Complaint due to a typographical error discovered on page 6. Corrected Complaint regenerated to attorney Baker and the Court. (MAS, ilcd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Davis and forwarded to the Plaintiff's attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Doug Brown and forwarded to the Plaintiff's attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James O. Langfelder and forwarded to the Plaintiff's attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Springfield and forwarded to the Plaintiff's attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Andrew Dunlevy. (Baker, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3078788.), filed by Andrew Dunlevy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baker, John) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/10/2019) (MAS, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunlevy v. Langfelder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Brown
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Represented By: John Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davis
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Represented By: John Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Springfield
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Represented By: John Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O. Langfelder
Represented By: Steven C Rahn
Represented By: John Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Dunlevy
Represented By: John A Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?