United States of America v. 9.6 Acres of Land et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Sangamon Coal Land, Inc., Joe Simpkins, Peerless Coal Company, 9.6 Acres of Land, more or less, Situate in Springfield, Illinois, Sangamon County Supervisor of Assessments, County of Sangamon, Sangamon Coal Land Inc and 9.6 Acres of Land
Case Number: 3:2019cv03116
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service by Publication for Defendants Peerless Coal and Sangamon Coal (Plant, Miles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service by Publication for Defendant Joe Simpkins (Plant, Miles)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Deposit Funds Estimate of Just Compensation into an Interest-Bearing Account in the Court's Registry by Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 6/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Plant, Miles)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. County of Sangamon waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Plant, Miles)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Declaration of Taking (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet by United States. (Plant, Miles)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN CONDEMNATION against All Defendants, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Authority, #2 Exhibit Schedule B - Public Purpose, #3 Exhibit Schedule C - Legal Description, #4 Exhibit Schedule D - Map, #5 Exhibit Schedule E - Estate Taken, #6 Exhibit Schedule F - Estimate of Just Compensation, #7 Exhibit Schedule G - Interested Parties)(Plant, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 9.6 Acres of Land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangamon Coal Land, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Simpkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Coal Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9.6 Acres of Land, more or less, Situate in Springfield, Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangamon County Supervisor of Assessments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sangamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sangamon Coal Land Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9.6 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Miles Hampson Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Miles Hampson Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?