Rippley v. Clevenger Contractors Inc.

Plaintiff: Glenn Rippley
Defendant: Clevenger Contractors Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv03207
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00650. .
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to CDIL. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/21/2019. (jdh)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY: Disputes which require a ruling on a motion made under Rule 37 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be handled in the following manner. The party seeking a discovery order shall request a prompt telephone conference with Judge Daly and opposing counsel by alerting the law clerk assigned to the case and providing the law clerk with appropriate material, such as: (1) a list or summary of the items in dispute, (2) copies of written requests/objections/privilege logs in dispute, and (3) an estimate of the amount of time needed to present argument to the Court. Law clerks prefer to receive these materials through Judge Daly's email depository for proposed documents. Prior to seeking a telephone conference with Judge Daly, the parties must meet and confer in an attempt to resolve the dispute informally. Argument on motions to compel discovery or for discovery sanctions shall be presented orally at the telephone conference. Written motions or legal memoranda will not be accepted unless specifically requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly on 8/2/2019. (jlm)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Scheduling and Discovery Conference: Scheduling and Discovery Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:45 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly. To join the conference call, the parties should call 888-273-3658. The access code is 1770924. The security code is 6500. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the conference call.(jlm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 CJRA TRACK B assigned: Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/19/2020 at 9:00 AM with a Jury Trial date of 8/31/2020 at 9:00 AM in Benton Courthouse before Judge J. Phil Gilbert.(tag)
July 23, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Glenn Rippley. (cds)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #13 Motion to Transfer Case filed by Clevenger Contractors Inc.. Incorrect event selected. Select the event which most closely matches the document being filed. E-filer is instructed to re-file using Civil>Other Filings>Other Documents>Affidavit.(kls3)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT by Clevenger Contractors Inc.. (Devereux, Joseph)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Timm W. Schowalter on behalf of Clevenger Contractors Inc. (Schowalter, Timm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Clevenger Contractors Inc..(Devereux, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN. MOTION to Transfer Case by Clevenger Contractors Inc.. (Devereux, Joseph) Modified on 7/19/2019 (kls3).
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clevenger Contractors Inc.. (Devereux, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Clevenger Contractors Inc.. Responses due by 8/19/2019 (Devereux, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Devereux, III on behalf of Clevenger Contractors Inc. (Devereux, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn Rippley. Clevenger Contractors Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (cds)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Clevenger Contractors Inc.. (cds)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #6 Summons Issued. Summons failed to include plaintiff's name and address. Clerk's office to issue a new summons and provide it to the US Marshals office this date. (cjo)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED.
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 STRICKEN - Summons Issued as to Clevenger Contractors Inc.. (cjo) Modified on 6/26/2019 (cjo).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, granting #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #4 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Glenn Rippley. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/18/2019. (jdh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Glenn Rippley. (cjo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glenn Rippley. (cjo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Clevenger Contractors Inc., filed by Glenn Rippley.(cjo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge J. Phil Gilbert and Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-650-JPG-RJD. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. Refer to the pro se litigant guide, found on the ILSD website, for further information. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rippley v. Clevenger Contractors Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clevenger Contractors Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Francis Devereux, III
Represented By: Timm Schowalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Rippley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?