Batiste v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak
Plaintiff: Deborah Batiste
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak
Case Number: 3:2019cv03218
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Richard Mills
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Tuesday, 11/19/2019, at 9:30 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 11/15/2019. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(E) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak.(Laing, Susan)
October 16, 2019 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading #5 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 10/21/2019. (LB, ilcd)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. Responses due by 10/29/2019 (Laing, Susan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Susan K Laing on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak (Laing, Susan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Deborah Batiste. (Marcus, Robert)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. (SKN, ilcd)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3194285.), filed by Deborah Batiste. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons in a Civil Action, #3 Supplement Certificate of Interest, #4 Supplement Entry of Appearance)(Marcus, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batiste v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Batiste
Represented By: Robert P Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?