MobiMeds, Inc. v. E-MedRX Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MobiMeds, Inc., d/b/a The Pill Club and MobiMeds, Inc.
Defendant: E-MedRX Solutions Inc and Debbie Drennan
Case Number: 3:2019cv03224
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Referring Judge: Sue E Myerscough
2 Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification re #9 Notice of Appearance of Attorney, #8 Notice of Appearance of Attorney. Original Notices for Todd Mizeski and for Steven Bennet replaced with uneditable versions. (SKN, ilcd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MobiMeds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D)(Herman, David)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on E-MedRx Solutions, Inc. on 10/15/2019, filed by MobiMeds, Inc.. (Mizeski, Todd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MobiMeds, Inc.. Debbie Drennan waiver sent on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Mizeski, Todd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Charles Stephenson on behalf of Debbie Drennan, E-MedRX Solutions Inc (Stephenson, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven L Bennet on behalf of MobiMeds, Inc. (Bennet, Steven) (Main Document 9 replaced with uneditable version on 11/14/2019) (SKN, ilcd).
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Todd Mizeski on behalf of MobiMeds, Inc. (Mizeski, Todd) (Main Document 8 replaced with uneditable version on 11/14/2019) (SKN, ilcd).
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James Bryan Novy on behalf of All Defendants (Novy, James)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Patrick R Moran on behalf of All Defendants (Moran, Patrick)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 ALIAS Summons Issued as to MobiMeds, Inc. (SKN, ilcd) Modified on 10/2/2019 to show as ALIAS (SKN, ilcd). (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/2/2019 with summonses showing attorneys' information (SKN, ilcd).
October 1, 2019 Judge Colin Stirling Bruce added. Judge Sue E. Myerscough no longer assigned to case. (SKN, ilcd)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on October 1, 2019. This case is reassigned to Judge Colin S. Bruce for further proceedings. (HR, ilcd)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Debbie Drennan, E-MedRX Solutions Inc. (SKN, ilcd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit re #1 Complaint, by MobiMeds, Inc., d/b/a The Pill Club. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Herman, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 & Designation of Lead Counsel by MobiMeds, Inc., d/b/a The Pill Club. (Herman, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3198727.), filed by MobiMeds, Inc., d/b/a The Pill Club. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Debbie Drennan, #3 Summons - E-MedRx Solutions, Inc.)(Herman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MobiMeds, Inc. v. E-MedRX Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-MedRX Solutions Inc
Represented By: James Bryan Novy
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Michael Charles Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Drennan
Represented By: James Bryan Novy
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Michael Charles Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MobiMeds, Inc., d/b/a The Pill Club
Represented By: David A Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MobiMeds, Inc.
Represented By: David A Herman
Represented By: Steven L Bennet
Represented By: Todd Mizeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?