Horman v. Lawrence
Petitioner: Willliam Horman and William Horman
Respondent: Frank Lawrence
Not Yet Classified: Habeas Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv03255
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Colin Stirling Bruce
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/10/2020. (KM, ilcd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Amended 2254 Petition by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Amended 2254 Petition, #2 Exhibits Part 1, #3 Exhibits Part 2, #4 Exhibits Part 3, #5 Envelope) (KM, ilcd)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/27/19. Petitioner does not appear to have the financial means to pay the filing fee. Thus, Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #8 is GRANTED. (KM, ilcd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Petitioner re Conflict of Interest on Appellate Case. (DS, ilcd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner William Horman. Responses due by 1/3/2020. (DS, ilcd)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Horman from Menard CC to Lawrence CC. (DS, ilcd)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 12/6/2019. Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time, which is construed as a Motion for Leave to Amend #3 is GRANTED. Petitioner's amended petition is due within 30 days of the entry of this order. Petitioner's Motion to Request Counsel #4 is DENIED. Petitioner's $5.00 filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis is due within 30 days of the entry of this order. See written Order. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2020; Prisoner Prepayment due by 1/6/2020)(DS, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Willliam Horman. (DS, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Petitioner Willliam Horman. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (DS, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Petitioner Willliam Horman. Responses due by 12/10/2019. (DS, ilcd)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Court from Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Attached Documents) (DS, ilcd)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce directing the Petitionerto pay the filing fee of $5.00 within 30 days of this Order. If Petitioner is unable to pay the required filing fee, he may file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. If Petitioner fails to pay the required filing fee or file a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within 30 days, his Petition under 28 U.S.C. ' 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in State Custody #1 will be dismissed without prejudice by this court. Entered on 10/31/2019. (ME, ilcd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Willliam Horman.(ME, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horman v. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Habeas Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frank Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willliam Horman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Horman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?