Kelley v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Paul F Kelley
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv03016
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
February 24, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Friday, 3/27/2020, at 9:30 AM (court will place call) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 3/25/2020. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Reitz, Kurt)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Norfolk Southern Railway Company.(Reitz, Kurt)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kurt E Reitz on behalf of Norfolk Southern Railway Company (Reitz, Kurt)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Paul F Kelley as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Brien, Patrick)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Original returned to Attorney Patrick S. O'Brien to effectuate service. (GL, ilcd)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norfolk Southern Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3282898.), filed by Paul F Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Patrick) Modified to reflect Complaint against Defendant on 1/16/2020 (GL, ilcd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Kurt E Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul F Kelley
Represented By: Patrick S O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?