Hagele v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michelle Lynn Hagele
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Attorney General of the United States and Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv03100
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification re #8 Return of Service Executed - Modified to correct service date. Regenerated to parties. (GL, ilcd)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Michelle Lynn Hagele as to U.S. Attorney General on 5/11/2020. (GL, ilcd) Modified to correct service date on 6/3/2020 (GL, ilcd).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/5/2020. (GL, ilcd)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Frooman, Hilary)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Costello, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/14/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(GL, ilcd)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 4/13/2020. (GL, ilcd)
April 8, 2020 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Event type corrected from a petition to a motion. Regenerated to parties. (GL, ilcd)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Michelle Lynn Hagele.(Costello, Michael) Modified to correct event type from Petition to Motion on 4/8/2020 (GL, ilcd).
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Michelle Lynn Hagele against Attorney General of the United States, Office of Regional Chief Counsel, U.S. Attorney's Office, filed by Michelle Lynn Hagele. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Summons)(Costello, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagele v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Regional Chief Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US ATTY-SPRINGFIELD SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Lynn Hagele
Represented By: Michael J Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CSS-Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?