Foremost Insurance Company v. HP Inc
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company
Defendant: HP Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv03201
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sue E Myerscough
Referring Judge: Tom Schanzle-Haskins
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/02/2020. (SKN, ilcd)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. TIME LIMITS AND SETTINGS ARE ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: Amended Pleadings / Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2021; Fact Discovery due by 5/28/2021; Plaintiff`s Expert Disclosure due by 6/28/2021; Defendant`s Expert Disclosure due by 8/27/2021; Expert Discovery due by 11/29/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set 4/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 in Springfield before U.S. Magistrate Judge. Jury Trial set 5/3/2022 at 9:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge. Telephonic Status Conference set Tuesday, 11/30/2021, at 10:30 AM by telephone from Springfield (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. See written order. Attachment: #(1) Courtroom Technology Brochure) (LB, ilcd)
October 2, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 10/2/2020 with Attorneys Steven Thompson, Bradley Hamblock, and Stacy Fulco. Written Scheduling Order to follow. (LB, ilcd)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing and Certificate of Service for Plaintiff's Rule 26 Disclosures (Hamblock, Bradley)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Fulco, Stacy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 DISCOVERY PLAN - PROPOSED/Report of Rule 26(f)Planning Meeting by Foremost Insurance Company. (Hamblock, Bradley)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set Friday, 10/2/2020, at 11:30 AM (court will place call) before U.S.Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Attorneys are directed to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) by meeting as soon as practicable, and in any event at least fourteen (14) days prior to the scheduling conference, and are to submit a proposed discovery plan in writing to the Court on or before 9/30/2020. Such a plan must include, at a minimum, those items listed in CDIL-LR 26.2(3), Rule 16(b), Rule 26(f), and CDIL-LR 16.2(F) with proposed deadlines. The parties are directed to specifically address the provisions, if any, for discovery or disclosure of electronically stored information, and to discuss agreements, if any, the parties reach for asserting claims of privilege or of protection as trial preparation material, after inadvertent production. Any plan filed shall specifically address the need, or lack thereof, concerning discovery of electronically stored information. If a discovery plan is not submitted as required, the scheduling hearing will not be held and costs may be assessed. Lead counsel or other counsel of record with knowledge of the case should be available to participate in the Rule 16 scheduling hearing. (LB, ilcd)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Hamblock, Bradley)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Bradley Michael Hamblock on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(Hamblock, Bradley)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Steven Michael Thompson on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(Thompson, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Margaret Lauren MacNair on behalf of HP Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance)(MacNair, Margaret)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Notice of Removal filed 8/11/2020 reviewed. Plaintiff is given to 9/11/2020 to file objections and a motion to remand. Failure to do so is deemed to mean Plaintiff has no legal opposition to removal and this case may proceed in this court. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 08/14/2020. (SKN, ilcd)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Fulco, Stacy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Stacy Dolan Fulco on behalf of HP Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance)(Fulco, Stacy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SHELBY COUNTY, case number 2020 L 7 ( Filing fee $ 400 ), filed by HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fulco, Stacy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2020: #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (SKN, ilcd).
August 11, 2020 Remark: Exhibit C and Civil Cover Sheet added as attachments to d/e #1 and regenerated to defendant's counsel. (SKN, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foremost Insurance Company v. HP Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Represented By: Stacy Dolan Fulco
Represented By: Margaret Lauren MacNair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley M. Hamblock
Represented By: Steven M. Thompson
Represented By: Bradley Michael Hamblock
Represented By: Steven Michael Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?