Ownbey v. Daubs et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Ownbey
Defendant: . Stuenkel, Jim Birdsell, . Smith, Jeff Host, Ashland Police Department, Springfield Police Department and Shawn Daubs
Case Number: 3:2020cv03202
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara Darrow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT entered in a civil case (SAG, ilcd)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 10/6/2020. This case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to pay the $400.00 filing fee within 21 days as directed by the Court's August 24, 2020 Text Order. All pending motions are denied as moot. Plaintiff remains responsible for the $400.00 filing fee. This case is closed.(SAG, ilcd)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/24/2020. Plaintiff states in his Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis that he has checking and savings accounts with a combined balance of $14,000.00 and that he owns a 2019 Kia vehicle. Plaintiff's Petition to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 is DENIED. Plaintiff shall pay the $400.00 filing fee in full within 21 days of this Order. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this claim without prejudice. (SAG, ilcd)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Kevin Ownbey (AEM, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk of Court to Jerome Combs Detention Center Trust Fund Dept. requesting ledgers 2/10/20 through 8/10/20 (SAG, ilcd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Kevin Ownbey. Responses due by 8/24/2020 (SAG, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Kevin Ownbey.(SAG, ilcd)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Ownbey.(SAG, ilcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ownbey v. Daubs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Stuenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Birdsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Host
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Daubs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ownbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?